Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: James Knapton and Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00044
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
1 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-44-ORL-41-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (EJS)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. (SPM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 1/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/23/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/9/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/23/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 1/9/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to James Knapton. (SPM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. (SPM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (SPM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-44-Orl-41KRS. (SJB)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14994224) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Knapton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?