Roor International BV et al v. Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc., d/b/a AK Food Store et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Abdur Rahaman, Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc., d/b/a AK Food Store and Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00051
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Anne C Conway
1 Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-51-ORL-22-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (EJS)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF by Abdur Rahaman, Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc.. (Patel, Prabodh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case/interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Abdur Rahaman, Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Patel, Prabodh)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(DEFENDANT). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/28/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/14/2019. (RMF)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Abdur Rahaman, Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc..(Patel, Prabodh)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/1/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/18/2019. (RMF)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Abdur Rahaman, Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc. (RMF)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RMF)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-51-Orl-22KRS. (SJB)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14999993) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc., d/b/a AK Food Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdur Rahaman
Represented By: Prabodh C. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc., d/b/a AK Food Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sathi Bithi Investment, Inc.
Represented By: Prabodh C. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?