Bank of America, N.A. v. Shuttleworth et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Mark Shuttleworth, Jaime Gamboa, Mainstreet Community Bank of Florida, a Florida Corporation and Mainstreet Community Bank of Florida
Case Number: 6:2019cv00054
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/11/19. (ESG)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corp., Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing for Bank of America, N.A... (Applegate, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, N.A.. Related case(s): yes (Applegate, David)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. #5 ) is DISCHARGED in light of Plaintiff's responses (Docs. #7 , #11 .) Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (MT)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order pdf filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Applegate, David) Modified on 1/28/2019 (LMM).
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/24/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/24/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On or before Friday, January 25, 2019, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a supplemental response consistent with the directives of this Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/18/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to show cause filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Applegate, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O)(Applegate, David)
January 11, 2019 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 1/18/2019 (BIA)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to conduct basic research before filing a complaint in this Court and the waste of judicial resources required for this sua sponte review as to Bank of America, N.A. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2019. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-54-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Bank of America N.A. (Applegate, David) Modified on 1/11/2019 (BIA).
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by Bank of America N.A. (Applegate, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15000502) filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Applegate, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Shuttleworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shuttleworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Community Bank of Florida, a Florida Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Community Bank of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: David M. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David M. Applegate
Represented By: William P. Heller
Represented By: Justin E. Hekkanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?