Gohlwar v. Precision Holdings of Brevard, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charan Gohlwar
Defendant: XYZ Corp., ABC Corp., Does 1-500 and Precision Holdings of Brevard, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00075
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: in light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice #9 , the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/26/2019. (BRS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Charan Gohlwar (Harvell, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his Certificate of Interested Persons and Notice of Pendency of Other Actions within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/1/2019. (BRS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/15/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/15/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent (mailed) to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with attachments) (JET)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Roger W. Strassburg and Hal S. Cohen of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). See signature block on Complaint. (JET)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Robert J. Squire of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). See signature block on Complaint. (JET)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Precision Holdings of Brevard, Inc. (JET)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand; Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL074849, filed by Charan Gohlwar. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JET) (This was filed by an attorney not admitted to practice in this court but signed by an attorney who is admitted.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gohlwar v. Precision Holdings of Brevard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charan Gohlwar
Represented By: Daniel S. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Holdings of Brevard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?