Johnson v. Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Kenyon Johnson
Defendant: Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 6:2019cv00125
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union with Jury Demand. filed by Kenyon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue and Envelope it was sent in, #3 Exhibit Job Classifications/Salary Ranges Policy Rev. 10/15, #4 Exhibit Job Classifications/Salary Ranges Policy Rev. 12/16)(Perez, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 3/20/2019 (LMM)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/14/2019.(ctp) (JLC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Unopposed MOTION to file Amended Complaint filed by Kenyon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Perez, Daniel) Modified on 3/14/2019 (LMM).
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-125-ORL-37-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (EJS)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/28/19. (ESG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union. Related case(s): yes (Works, Donald)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union. (Works, Donald)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union. (Works, Donald)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Change of Law Firm and Address by Kenyon Johnson (Perez, Daniel) Modified on 2/4/2019 (LMM).
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/31/19. (MT)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kenyon Johnson. (Perez, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kenyon Johnson. Related case(s): n (Perez, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/30/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/30/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union. (LMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-125-Orl-37KRS. (SJB)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15035260) filed by Kenyon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Perez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyon Johnson
Represented By: Daniel A. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Educators' Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Donald C. Works, III
Represented By: Matthew A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?