The Postcard Factory, Inc. v. Clean Harbors Florida, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE POSTCARD FACTORY INC. and The Postcard Factory, Inc.
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., CLEAN HARBORS FLORIDA LLC and Clean Harbors Florida, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00172
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/11/2019. (Conway, Anne)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by The Postcard Factory, Inc. (Reilly, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to show cause filed by The Postcard Factory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reilly, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/20/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/20/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/6/2019. (RMF)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause : Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before February 13, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond by the date provided will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/30/2019. (RN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Clean Harbors Florida, LLC, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. (RMF)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-172-Orl-22DCI. (SJB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15058316) filed by The Postcard Factory, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Reilly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Postcard Factory, Inc. v. Clean Harbors Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAN HARBORS FLORIDA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE POSTCARD FACTORY INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Postcard Factory, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?