Adams et al v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christine Adams and Daniel Adams
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. and Kia Motors Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00250
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Set deadlines: for Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. Answer due by 4/22/2019. (SPM)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Defendants Kia Motors America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor America, Inc., shall file their response to the Complaint on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/20/2019. (MDH)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Shepard on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. (Shepard, Katherine)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Kia Motors America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation, Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Kia Motors America, Inc... (Hosley, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Hyundai Motor America identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Corporation for Hyundai Motor America.. (Hosley, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Hosley on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. (Hosley, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2019, to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hosley, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 3/20/2019 (SPM).
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2019 by Daniel Adams, Christine Adams as to Kia Motors America, Inc. (Genadiev, Simeon) Modified on 3/14/2019 (SPM).
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2019 by Daniel Adams, Christine Adams as to Hyundai Motor America. (Genadiev, Simeon) Modified on 3/14/2019 (SPM).
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related case order by Christine Adams, Daniel Adams. Related case(s): No (Genadiev, Simeon) Modified on 3/14/2019 (SPM).
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order directing compliance, #4 Interested persons order by Christine Adams, Daniel Adams. (Genadiev, Simeon)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiffs to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 4), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 3). Responses due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/12/2019. (DJD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-250-Orl-41LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (SPM)
February 25, 2019 FILING FEES paid by All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL080802) (JP)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/14/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/28/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 2/14/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-250-Orl-41KRS. (SJB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Proposed Summons Hyundai Motor America, #8 Proposed Summons Hyundai Motor Company, #9 Proposed Summons Kia Motors America, #10 Proposed Summons Kia Motors Corporation)(Genadiev, Simeon) Modified on 2/7/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified on 2/8/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Adams
Represented By: Simeon Genadiev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Adams
Represented By: Simeon Genadiev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?