Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC et al v. ClassicStar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Minor, Greg Minor and Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC
Defendant: Tony P. Ferguson, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Classicstar Farms, LLC, National Equine Lending Co., Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, Thomas J. Handler, New NEL, LLC, John Does, Terry L. Green, Geostar Financial Services Corp., ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC, First Equine Energy Partners, LLC, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Schiellack & Associates, Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Gastar Exploration, Ltd., Thomas J. Handler, J.D. P.C., John W. Parrott and Dwayne Schiellack
Petitioner: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Geostar Corp., ClassicStar Farms, Inc., James D. Lyon and Classicstar, LLC
Cross Defendant: Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II and National Equine Lending Company, L.C.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00262
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/13/2019. (copy mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/13/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 305 NOTICE to counsel (Jayson E. Blake, Jennifer Julie Cave, Emily H. Cowles, Lea Pauley Goff, Culver V. Halliday, Matthew R. Lindblom, John O'Neill Morgan, Jr., Amanda Lee Tomlin, T. Scott White, and David A. Owen) of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk).ctc (MAA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 304 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:07-cv-00348. File received electronically
February 4, 2019 Filing 303 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Withdrawing [Dkt] 2652 Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 2/5/2019 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 302 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Dana Goyak, John Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Designation of Contents of The Record to Be Remanded in The Event of A Remand Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 2/5/2019 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 301 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED re (2642 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 189 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Suggestion of Remand, (2641 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 299 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) Suggestion of Remand. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STC)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 300 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Opposition to Conditional Remand Order Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 1/30/2019 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER/SUGGESTION OF REMAND: Court suggests that this action be remanded to the transferor district court. Consolidated pretrial proceedings, including facilitation of discovery, are concluded in this action, and the case is ready for return to the transferor district for remaining proceedings and trial. The parties shall furnish, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, a designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STC)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying (1484) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH; denying (200) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/19/2019. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STC)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER: The Court, on its own motion, and to reflect the current status, rescinds the referrals to the undersigned on all referred civil cases. The presiding District Judge may enter a substitute referral, or issue other appropriate Orders, in his or her discretion. The Clerk shall docket this Order in all appropriate cases. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/13/2018.(JJ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (2606) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (2607) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (2611) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW; granting (256) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (257) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (259) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (292) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (294) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW; granting (484) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (485) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (486) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; granting (238) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(239) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (240) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW; granting (184) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated; (185) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (186) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW; granting (160) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (161) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (163) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/10/2017. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: (1) (881) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW; (2608) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW; (258) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW; (293) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW; (325) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW; (162) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW as counsel for Tony Ferguson and Thom Robinson by David A. Owen, Brian M. Johnson, Jennifer J. Cave, Matthew A. Stinnett, and Jason T. Ams is GRANTED; (2) Dfts Tony Ferguson and Thom Robinson should enter Notice of Appearance Pro Se or have new counsel enter a Notice of Appearance w/in 30 day. Failure to do so may result in entry of default where appropriate. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/29/2016. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 23, 2015 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (486 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 259 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 240 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 163 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 186 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 2611 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 294 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 20, 2015 Filing 294 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Declaration)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 24, 2014 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (881 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 325 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW, 293 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 258 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 162 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 2608 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tony Ferguson, Thom Robinson, Tony P. Ferguson, Thomas E. Robinson, Thomas Robinson Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 23, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tony Ferguson, Thom Robinson, Tony P. Ferguson, Thomas E. Robinson, Thomas Robinson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 14, 2014 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (485 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 239 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 2607 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 292 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 185 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 161 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 257 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 13, 2014 Filing 292 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jason W. Crowell)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 8, 2014 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (2606 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 184 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 291 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 256 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 160 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 238 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 484 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC and Substitution as Counsel Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 7, 2014 Filing 291 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC and Substitution as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 29, 2014 Sealed Document S-289. (MAA)
April 29, 2014 Filing 290 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC re (2581 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) Sealed Document,, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 288 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Opposition re (858 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 2571 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoStar Corporation filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2014 Filing 287 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Opposition re (851 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoStar Corporation filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 1/16/2014 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 286 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE to Take Deposition of GeoStar Corporation on 02/13/14 9:00 a.m. by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 1/14/2014 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 6, 2013 Filing 285 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 9/6/2013 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 284 NOTICE OF FILING by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc., Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer, II, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) re (152 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW) Notice, (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corrected Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 3, 2013 Filing 283 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer, II, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) Modified on 9/4/2013 (STC). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 27, 2012 Filing 282 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Sandra N Tillotson Notice of Removal from Service List Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Denney, Nathan) Modified on 4/27/2012 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER: (1) (219) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW; (217) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW; (100) Motion for Extension of Time; (102) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:07-cv-00351-JMH-REW; (104) Motion for Extension of Time; (106) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:07-cv-00352-JMH-REW; (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW; (77) Motion for Extension of Time; (79) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:08-cv-00017-JMH-REW; (343) Motion for Extension of Time; (346) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; (67) Motion for Extension of Time; (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:08-cv-00060-JMH-REW; (73) Motion for Extension of Time; (75) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:08-cv-00074-JMH-REW; (59) Motion for Extension of Time; (61) Motion for Extension of Time in case 5:08-cv-00418-JMH-REW GRANTED; (2) rebuttal expert rpts filed on or before 4/2/2010 DEEMED timely. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/5/2012. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB)cc: COR Modified on 4/13/2012 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Filing 280 JUDGMENT: (1) Plts entered into agreements with ClassicStar re Mare Leases and related agreements; (2) Plts filed this action in Middle District of Florida; action transferred; (3) Plts and ClassicStar have agreed to resolve all disputes between them; (4) Plts filed proof of claim no. 62 in ClassicStar's Title 11 proceeding pending in US Bankrutpcy Court; Plts shall file single amended proof of claim to conform to terms of stipulated judgment; (5) Judgment GRANTED to Plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor against ClassicStar, LLC in amt of $2,703,931.92 which shall take solely form of amended proof of claim; (6) other than as provided herein, all claims, causes asserted by Plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor against ClassicStar, LLC are DIMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER: (250 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1928 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, (232 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1631 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines relating to the Premiere Thoroughbreds Matter, (226 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time, (222 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Extension of Time, (253 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on Sealed Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Premiere Plaintiffs' Claims, (228 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, (204 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1507 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Dismiss, (162 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Joinder, (2025 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 259 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Joinder (1925 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave, (246 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gastar Exploration Ltd. on Fourth Amended Complaint of Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, and Stephanie Minor, (177 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Sanctions, (166 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION to Strike (1146 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) REPLY, (247 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on Sealed Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, and Stephanie Minor's Claims DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER: (1) all claims asserted by plts against Dfts Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer, III are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (2) Plt and Dfts Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer, III shall each BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS; (3) Court RETAINS JURISDICTION over case for purpose of enforcing settlement; (4) Order of Dismissal does not address any claims or causes of action asserted against dfts other than those specifically set forth herein; With respect to all claims and causes of action asserted against dfts who are subject to settlement, this is a final order and all relief not granted herein is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER: all claims asserted by Plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor against Dfts GeoStar Corporation, Tony P. Ferguson, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, Inc. and GeoStar Financial Services Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER: Plts' claims against First Equine Energy Partners, LLC and ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables and all claims against New NEL, LLC, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) The Motion is DENIED AS MOOT ( #175 in 5:07-cv-348, #140 in 5:07-cv-419, #150 in 5:08-cv-321). 2) The #279 in 5:08-cv-53 is GRANTED. 3) Plas in 5:08-cv-53 shall SERVE on counsel for the Plummers, w/in 10 days of entry of this Order, answer and documents in response to Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 and Requests for Production Nos. 1 and 2 on Dfts' Master List of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. There materials are to be designated for "Attorneys Eyes Only" and are subject to the terms/conditions set forth in the Protective Order (DE #89 in 5:08-cv-53). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW(SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plas' Motion for Sanctions and the Motion to Join that Motion for Sanctions are GRANTED as set forth below. 2) That GeoStar Corporation is precluded from disputing the authenticity of documents appearing to have been created or received by GeoStar or its agents. 3) That the testimony offered by GeoStar Corporation's designee may be used by any party only insofar as it contains admissions against GeoStar itself and as offered against GeoStar. 4) GeoStar Corporation is estopped from denying the assertions set forth by Plas and other parties to this motion in paragraphs (a) through (s) of Pla's Memo in Support of its Motion for Sanctions and paragraphs (1) through (13) in the Memo in Support of the Joinder in Plas' Motion. 5) Motions as filed in 09-cv-15 (DE #76 and #78 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. 6) Plummer parties' Motion is STRICKEN from 09-cv-167 (DE #14 ) as it appears that the parties did not intend to file the motion in that individual case. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that the ( 1065 in 5:07-cv-353) Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Production of Audit Report is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 14, 2012 Filing 272 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Sandra N Tillotson Notice of Removal from Service List Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Denney, Nathan) Modified on 3/15/2012 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER: It is ordered that all claims against ClassicStar Farms, LLC, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/29/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 29, 2012 Party ClassicStar Farms, LLC terminated per Order entered 2/29/2012 (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 26, 2012 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (270 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 2398 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by James D. Lyon, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, (221 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW, 2401 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by Ora-Oli Halfon, Uri Halfon, Su-Sim, LLC, James D. Lyon, (220 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW, 2400 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by AA-J Breeding, LLC, James D. Lyon, (219 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW, 2399 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by Derby Stakes, LLC, James D. Lyon Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 25, 2012 Filing 270 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by James D. Lyon, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW(Forte, Earl) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 3, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE by Arkoma Basin Development, Inc., Associated Geophysical Services, Inc., BNG Producing & Drilling, Brookstone Development, Ltd., CBM Resources Pty, Ltd., Cadillac Farms, Inc., ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Thoroughbreds of Kentucky, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Conquest Exploration, Inc., Conquest Group Operating Company, Tony P. Ferguson, First Source Bossier, L.L.C., First Source Texas, Inc., First Source Wyoming, Inc., First Texas Gas, LP, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Geostar Financial Corporation, Geostar Leasing Corporation, Frederick J. Lambert, Thomas E. Robinson, Royalty Acquisition Company, Boyce J. Sanderson, Squaw Creek Development, Inc., Squaw Creek, Inc., Tartan Business, L.C., West Virginia Development, Inc., West Virginia Gas Corporation Notice of Change of Law Firm Name Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 268 DUPLICATE Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00351-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH -REW(Sim, J.) Modified on 12/28/2011 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER: (1) Motions to Withdraw GRANTED; (2342 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 301 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (2340 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 251 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (212 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH -REW, 2343 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (266 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 2341 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; (2) David Owen, Brian Johnson, Matthew Stinnett and Jason Ams STRICKEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD for Dft ClassicStar Farms, LLC; (3) all parties shall SHOW CAUSE w/in 10 days why claims against ClassicStar Farms, LLC should not be dismissed w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/8/2011.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00347-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH -REW(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 4, 2011 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (2340 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 251 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, (2341 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 266 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, (212 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH -REW, 2343 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, (2339 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, (301 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW, 2342 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, (763 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 266 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 3, 2011 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (2338 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 82 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, (2337 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 215 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, (265 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 2336 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH -REW, 5:08-cv-00104-JMH -REW(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 265 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION of Dismissal by ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Tony P. Ferguson, Geostar Corp., Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Geostar Financial Services Corp., Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Thomas E. Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH -REW(Johnson, Brian) Modified on 11/3/2011 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: (1) (513) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW; (1796) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW; (110) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00351-JMH-REW; (232) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW; (244) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW; (392) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; (204) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW granted; (2) Brian Johnson, David Owen, Matthew Stinnett, Jason Ams, Jennifer Artis (now Jennifer Cave) & Greenebaum, Doll & McDonald permitted to WITHDRAW as counsel & shall be STRICKEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD for John Parrot. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/15/2011. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 16, 2011 Sealed Document S-263. (MAA)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Gastar's (269 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH -REW, 162 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 2054 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 211 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW, 608 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 261 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 449 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 243 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW) CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss GRANTED; All claims by any plt against Gastar Exploration Ltd., Gastar Exploration New South Wales, Inc., Gastar Exploration Power Pty, Ltd., Gastar Exploration Texas LLC, Gastar Exploration Texas, Inc., Gastar Exploration Texas, LP, Gastar Exploration USA, Inc. DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plts & Gastar Dfts each bear own fees & costs; Until payments re settlement made, Court retains jurisdiction; Order does not address claims asserted against other dfts; all relief not granted herein is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/17/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 261 CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd., Gastar Exploration New South Wales, Inc., Gastar Exploration Power Pty, Ltd., Gastar Exploration Texas LLC, Gastar Exploration Texas, Inc., Gastar Exploration Texas, LP, Gastar Exploration USA, Inc., Gastar Exploration Victoria, Inc. with prejudice pursuant to settlement (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 15, 2010 Filing 260 NOTICE OF FILING by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC re (2025 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Joinder (1925 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC MOTION for Joinder (1925 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 15, 2010 Filing 259 MOTION for Joinder (1925 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 15, 2010 Filing 258 RESPONSE to (1975 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 255 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) Gastar Objections to evidence submitted by plts filed by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Gastar's First Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to the Premiere Thoroughbreds Plaitniffs, #3 Exhibit 2- Damage Report for Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor, #4 Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor and Premiere Thoroughbreds)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) Modified on 10/18/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER: (1) Motions to Continue (5:07-cv-353-JMH, 1895 , 1994 , 2001 ; 5:06-cv-243-JMH, DE 554, 587, 589; 5:07-cv-419-JMH, DE 184, 198, 199; 5:09-cv-215-JMH, DE 191, 235, 239) GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, & portion re severance REMAIN PENDING IN PART; (2) JURY TRIAL in 06-cv-243, 07-cv-419 & 09-cv-215 CONTINUED to 4/12/2011 at 9:00 AM before Judge Joseph M. Hood; Counsel present by 8:30 AM; (3) motions in limine re 06-243, 07-419 & 09-215 FILED by 2/18/2011; (4) pretrial filings due one week before final PTC; (5) 06-cv-243, 07-cv-419 & 09-cv-215 set for FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 3/21/2011 at 1:30 PM before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (6) Motions to Continue or Stay (5:07-cv-353-JMH, 1932 , 1991 ; 5:06-cv-243-JMH, DE 567, 585; 5:07-cv-347-JMH, DE 236; 5:07-cv-348-JMH, DE 252; 5:07-cv-351-JMH, DE 112; 5:07-cv-352-JMH, DE 113; 5:07-cv-419-JMH, DE 185, 196; 5:08-cv-53-JMH, DE 431; 5:08-cv-321-JMH, DE 206; 5:09-cv-215-JMH, DE 201, 232) DENIED AS MOOT; (7) response to Gastar's Motion to Compel (5:07-cv-353-JMH, 2000 ; 5:09-cv-215-JMH, 238) due by 10/15/2010; reply due 5 days after response. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/8/2010. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,D,JC,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 4, 2010 Filing 256 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Beechglen Farms, John Hales, Dumar Horses, L.C. of Withdrawal Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Kennedy, Ellen) Modified text on 10/5/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 27, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (253 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1972 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Gastar Exploration Ltd. to Exceed Page Limits on Sealed Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Premiere Plaintiffs' Claims Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 24, 2010 Sealed Document S-254. (MAA)
September 24, 2010 Sealed Document S-255. (MAA)
September 24, 2010 Filing 253 MOTION for Leave by Gastar Exploration Ltd. to Exceed Page Limits on Sealed Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Premiere Plaintiffs' Claims. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) Modified on 9/27/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 7, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (250 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1928 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, (1930 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 430 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dana Goyak, John Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 3, 2010 Sealed Document S-251. (MAA)
September 3, 2010 Filing 252 MOTION to Continue by John W. Parrott Defendant John W. Parrott's Motion For A Continuance Of The November 30, 2010 Trial Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay Of The Claims Against Him (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Halliday, Culver). Added MOTION to Stay on 9/7/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 3, 2010 Filing 250 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC Motions referred to Robert E. Wier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 26, 2010 Filing 249 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Reply by Gastar Exploration, Ltd., Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Gastar Exploration Ltd.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 6, 2010 Sealed Document S-248. (MAA)
August 6, 2010 Filing 247 MOTION for Leave by Gastar Exploration Ltd. to Exceed Page Limits on Sealed Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, and Stephanie Minor's Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) Modified on 8/23/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 246 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gastar Exploration Ltd. on Fourth Amended Complaint of Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, and Stephanie Minor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 28, 2010 Attorney Update. Attorney Lea Pauley Goff, Culver V. Halliday, Matthew R. Lindblom for John Parrot. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 27, 2010 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Lindblom on behalf of John W. Parrott Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Lindblom, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 27, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1777 in 5:07-cv-353; 165 in 5:09-cv-215) Motion for leave to exceed page limits; (1778 in 5:07-cv-353; 386 in 5:08-cv-53) Motion to Seal Document; (1783 in 5:07-cv-353; 508 in 5:06-cv-343) Motion for leave to file excess pages; (1785 in 5:07-cv-353; 510 in 5:06-cv-243) Motion for leave to file excess pages; (1786 in 5:07-cv-353; 511 in 5:06-cv-243) Motion for leave to file excess pages; (1794 in 5:07-cv-353; 512 in 5:06-cv-243; 391 in 5:08-cv-43; 168 in 5:09-cv-215) Motion for extension of time; (1796 in 5:07-cv-353) Motion to withdraw; (1802 in 5:07-cv-353; 515 in 5:06-cv-243) Motion for leave to file excess pages; (1805 in 5:07-cv-353; 173 in 5:09-cv-215) Motion for leave to file excess pages. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 26, 2010 Filing 244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John W. Parrott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 9, 2010 Filing 243 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES of Expert Witnesses by Gastar Exploration Ltd..Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 2, 2010 Filing 242 NOTICE by Gastar Exploration Ltd. of Third-Party Subpoenas for Depositions and Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Samuels Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Lewis Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Shaw Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Main Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Behm Subpoena, #6 Exhibit Brackob Subponea, #7 Exhibit Schiellack Subpoena)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 21, 2010 Filing 241 INCORRECTLY FILED DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James D. Lyon. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Goldman, Jonathan) Modified on 6/22/2010 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held 6/7/2010 before Judge Joseph M. Hood: (1) this matter ASSIGNED FOR TRIAL BY JURY AS TO TRACK I CASES ORIGINALLY FILED IN EDKY & SOLE MATTER IN TRACK III ON 11/30/2010 AT 9:00 AM in LEXINGTON; trial time estimated at 2-3 weeks; (2) the following motions to appear telephonically at status conference or excuse appearance GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Requesting parties & counsel excused from appearance but not permitted to appear telephonically. Obj to consolidation of certain matters not originating in EDKY noted by Court. (1655) Motion for Order; (1662) Motion for Order; (1664) Motion for Order; (1666) Motion for Order; (1667) Motion for leave; (1668) Motion for Leave; (1669) Motion for Order; (1673) Motion for Order; (1674) Motion for Order; (1676) Motion for Leave; (1677) Motion for Leave in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW; (226) Motion for Leave in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW; (220) Motion for Order in case 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW; (238) Motion for Order in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW; (170) Motion for Leave in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW; (353) Motion for Leave in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; (85) Motion for Order in case 5:08-cv-00074-JMH-REW; (166) Motion for Order in case 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW; (199) Motion for Leave in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW; (66) Motion for Order in case 5:08-cv-00418-JMH-REW; (91) Motion for Order in case 5:08-cv-00487-JMH-REW; (139) Motion for Order in case 5:08-cv-00496-JMH-REW. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/14/2010.(Court Reporter Ann Banta.) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al. (STB)cc: COR,D,JC,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 4, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1677 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 170 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Donna Hacker, Errol Skinner to Appear Telephonically at June 7, 2010 Status Conference, (226 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 1676 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave by Jean Hertzog, Leo Hertzog, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JUNE 7, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE, (1673 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 166 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW) MOTION for Order by AA-J Breeding, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Ora-Oli Halfon, Uri Halfon, Su-Sim, LLC to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at June 7, 2010 Status Conference or, in the Alternative, to Allow Barry D. Hunter to Specifically Appear, (238 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 1674 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Order by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at June 7, 2010 Status Conference or, in the Alternative, to Allow Barry D. Hunter to Specifically Appear for the Premiere Plt , (1672 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 355 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Pleadings & Exhibits Under Seal by Dana Goyak, John Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER, Track I STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/7/2010 is ADVANCED to 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/3/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,D,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 3, 2010 Filing 238 MOTION for Order by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at June 7, 2010 Status Conference or, in the Alternative, to Allow Barry D. Hunter to Specifically Appear for the Premiere Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER, STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/7/2010 at 1:30 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/19/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,MDL,D [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 18, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1603 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 228 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Fourth Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 17, 2010 Filing 236 REPLY to (1603 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW), (228 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Gastar Exploration Ltd.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) Modified links on 5/18/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 12, 2010 NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Magistrate Judge James B Todd is no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier for all further proceedings pursuant to General Order No. 10-08. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES RELATING TO PREMIERE THOROUGHBREDS MATTER: (a) Fact Discovery due by 6/25/2010; (b) expert reports due by 4/23/2010; (c) Premiere Plts expert reports on damages due by 5/14/2010; (c) dfts rebuttal rpts due by 7/2/2010; (d) expert discovery due by 7/23/2010; (e) Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2010; all other pretrial deadlines remain unaffected; does not affect any matter other than Premiere. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/28/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND: Plts to file response to Gastar's mtn to dismiss fourth amd cmp by 4/28/2010; Gastar file Reply by 5/17/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/28/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2010 Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #228 MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unpublished Opinions)(Blake, Jayson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2010: #3 Unpublished Opinions, Part 1, #4 Unpublished Opinions, Part 2) (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 26, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1631 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 232 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time by Gastar Exploration Ltd. to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines relating to the Premiere Thoroughbreds Matter Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 23, 2010 Filing 232 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time by Gastar Exploration Ltd. to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines relating to the Premiere Thoroughbreds Matter Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 22, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1623 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 154 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-JBT) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (1624 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 231 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-JBT(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 21, 2010 Filing 231 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Gastar Exploration Ltd. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(Blake, Jayson) Modified filers on 4/22/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 6, 2010 Filing 230 DISCLOSURES of Expert Witnesses by Gastar Exploration Ltd..Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 2, 2010 Filing 229 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Expert Report of Sulaksh R. Shah by GeoStar Corporation.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 31, 2010 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Porter Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(Powers, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DEADLINES: 1) Paragraph 3(c) of this Court's 9/2/2009 Order (DE 1315 in 07-cv-353) is amended as follows: "rebuttal expert reports shall be due on or before 4/6/2010." 2) All other pretrial deadlines remain unaffected by this Agreed Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/30/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-353, 5:06-cv-243, 5:07-cv-347, 5:07-cv-348, 5:08-cv-53, 5:08-cv-79.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 29, 2010 Filing 226 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Thoroughbreds of Kentucky, LLC, Tony Ferguson, First Source Wyoming, Inc., GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 29, 2010 Filing 225 INCORRECTLY FILED INITIAL DISCLOSURES by James D. Lyon.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Forte, Earl) Modified on 3/30/2010 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 25, 2010 Filing 224 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Expert Deadlines by Gastar Exploration Ltd., West Hills Farms, et al, John Goyak, et al, Gregory R. Raifman, et al, AA-J Breeding, Premiere Thoroughbreds, GeoStar Corp, et al, David Plummer, et al. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Powers, Jason) Modified filers on 3/26/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 5, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (204 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT, 1507 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 4, 2010 Filing 223 REPLY BRIEF to (204 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT, 1507 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-JBT(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 1, 2010 Filing 222 MOTION for Extension of Time by ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Thoroughbreds of Kentucky, LLC, Tony Ferguson, First Source Wyoming, Inc., GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 25, 2010 Filing 221 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy re (20 in 5:09-cv-00338-JMH) MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy in Connection with GeoStar's Breach of the Purchase Agreement and GeoStar's Counterclaim Regarding the Purchase Agreement, (1585 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Oermann, David) Modified on 2/26/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 16, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1484 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 200 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, et al, (1575 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 62 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wilmington Trust FSB, (190 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 1576 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Extension of Time to File expert disclosures by Neil Baker, et al Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 15, 2010 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re (204 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1507 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) filed by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Blake, Jayson) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 12, 2010 Filing 219 REPLY to Response to Motion re (200 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1484 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Tony Ferguson, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., John Parrot, Thom Robi filed by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, Inc., Geostar Financial Services Corp.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: (1567) Motion to Substitute Attorney; (217) Motion to Substitute Attorney granted; Jayson Blake substituted for Judy Clausen and Niels Murphy as to Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/10/2010. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 9, 2010 Filing 217 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2010 Filing 216 RESPONSE to Motion re (200 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH; 1484 in 5:07-cv-353) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Tony Ferguson, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., John Parrot, Thom Robi Response to Motino to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) Modified link on 2/2/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2010 Filing 215 NOTICE by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor Designation of Expert Witnesses Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF EXPERT DEADLINES re (202 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1522 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 137 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 155 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 211 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 183 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 209 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION for Extension of Time by Errol Skinner, et al (1) Paragraphs 4 & 5 of 12/8/2008 Order further amended as follows: Except for Track I dfts brought into Track I after 12/2/2008, expert reports on issues where party bears burden of proof due by 1/29/2010; rebuttal experts by 3/15/2010; expert discovery by depo by 5/14/2010; supplementation of rpts due pursuant to Rule 26(e)(2); (2) all other pretrial deadlings remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/22/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: Deadline for plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, et al to respond to Motion of Strategic Opportunity Solutions to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint extended to 2/15/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/20/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: all claims of plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, et al against dfts Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. and Terry L. Green are dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to terms of Settlement Agreement; USDC District of Utah having jurisdiction to enforce terms of Settlement Agreement; parties pay own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/20/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 20, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (210 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1527 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 19, 2010 Filing 210 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 19, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1511 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 182 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation,, (1513 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 206 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (201 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1514 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (154 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 1516 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (210 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1512 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (455 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 1517 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (57 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 1515 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 19, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (202 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 183 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 209 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 155 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 211 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1522 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 137 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION for Extension of Time by Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, Gekko Breeding and Racing, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Ra, (198 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 451 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 1488 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 132 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2010 Filing 213 Summons Issued as to Geostar Financial Services Corp., Gastar Exploration, Ltd.; issued summons returned to counsel via U.S. Mail (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2010 Filing 209 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, Gekko Breeding and Racing, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman For Additional Extension of Expert Deadlines Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Additional Extension of Expert Deadlines)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Springer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2010 Filing 208 NOTICE OF FILING by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor re #193 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, Notice Requesting Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Geostar Financial Summons)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2010 Filing 207 NOTICE OF FILING by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor re #193 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, Notice Requsting Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Gastar Summons)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 15, 2010 Filing 206 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of dismissal by Terry L. Green, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Tomlin, Amanda) Modified text on 1/19/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 8, 2010 Filing 205 JOINT ANSWER to #193 Fourth Amended Complaint by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III. (Filed in Master file and refiled herein for case management purposes)(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 8, 2010 Filing 204 MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Defendant Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6))Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: (1) Plts Premiere Thorougbreds, et al's Motion to Substitute (R. 1481 in 07-cv-353, R. 199 in 07-cv-438) GRANTED; (2) Clerk shall STRIKE Fourth Amended Complaint & Exhibits filed 11/16/2009 & SUBSTITUTE tendered Fourth Amended Complaint & Exhibits; (3) ClassicStar Farms, LLC, et al's Motion to Dismiss (R. 200) filed 12/15/09 DEEMED timely filed; (4) Dfts S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer & Strategic Opportunity Solutions have until 1/8/2010 to answer Fourth Amended Cmp; (5) Dfts Karren, Hendrix, Stagg, Allen & Co, and Terry Green have until 1/29/2010 to answer Fourth Amended Cmp; (6) Dfts' Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Cmp (R. 78, R. 80 in 07-cv-348, R. 350, R. 358 in 07-cv-353) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/8/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: Deadline for Plts Premiere Thoroughbreds, et al to respond to Dft GeoStar Corp, et al's Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint is extended to 2/1/2010. No further extension granted except for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/5/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 5, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (201 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1496 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending time to respond, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 4, 2010 Filing 201 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending time to respond by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Tony Ferguson, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) Modified filers on 1/5/2010 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 15, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Tony Ferguson, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motion to Dismiss Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC et al.'s Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 15, 2009 Filing 199 MOTION substitute document re (186 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1364 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Leave to File by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Fourth Amended Complaint (corrected), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Marketing Memo, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 9/9/04 Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 10/30/03 Letter of Intent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - FEEP letter converting mare lease interests, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Sample financial breakdown, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Copy of Cashier's check, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Confirmation of receipt of funds from ClassicStar, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 part 1 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 part 2 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Payment for participating in Program, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - 12/31/03 letters confirming receipt of payments, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Program Agreements, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Illustration concerning conversion, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - 2003 Income & Expense Summary, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - IRS refund checks, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - 6/11/04 wire confirmation, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - letter from ClassicStar re insurance policy, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Green correspondence w/the IRS, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Spencer and David Plummer's Cross Claim, #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 8, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (198 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (1478 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension of time to respond to Fourth Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 7, 2009 Filing 198 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension to answer or respond to Fourth Amended Complaint by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Terry L. Green, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. (Tomlin, Amanda) Modified text, filers on 12/8/2009 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 3, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (197 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1476 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending time to answer fourth amended complaint, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 2, 2009 Filing 197 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Date to January 8, 2010, to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 2, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (196 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1472 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending time to answer Fourth Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 1, 2009 Filing 196 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Fourth Amended Complaint by ClassicStar Thoroughbreds of Kentucky, LLC, Stephanie Minor, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., Geostar Financial Services Corp., Greg Minor. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: (1) Paragraphs 4 & 5 of 12/8/2008 Order are amended as follows: Except for Track I dfts brought in after 12/2/2008, Expert rpts on issue where party bears burden of proof filed by 1/15/2010; rebuttal expert rpts due by 3/1/2010; expert discovery by depo completed by 4/30/2010; (2) Paragraph (3)(a) of 9/2/2009 Order amended, for Track I dfts brought in after 12/2/2008, fact discovery due by 2/22/2010; (3) all other pretrial deadlines remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/24/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 24, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1456 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 56 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 320 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 70 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 66 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 448 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 195 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 73 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 208 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 97 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 64 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 152 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 177 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 194 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 129 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 80 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 23, 2009 Filing 194 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Expert Deadlines by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2009 Filing 193 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., New NEL, LLC, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Geostar Financial Services Corp., Gastar Exploration, Ltd., ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Terry L. Green, Tony P. Ferguson, S. David Plummer, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, Spencer D. Plummer, III, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC, First Equine Energy Partners, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Does, filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Marketing Memo, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9/9/04 Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/30/03 Letter of Intent, #4 Exhibit 4 - FFEP letter converting mare lease interests, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sample financial breakdown, #6 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Cashier's check, #7 Exhibit 7 - Confirmation of receipt of funds from Classicstar, #8 Exhibit 8 part 1 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit 8 part 2 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, #10 Exhibit 9 - Payment for participating in Program, #11 Exhibit 10 - 12/31/03 letters confirming receipt of payments, #12 Exhibit 11 - Program Agreements, #13 Exhibit 12 - Illustration concerning conversion, #14 Exhibit 13 - 2003 Income & Expense Summary, #15 Exhibit 14 - IRS Refund checks, #16 Exhibit 15 - 6/11/04 wire confirmation & letter, #17 Exhibit 16 - letter from Classicstar re insurance policy, #18 Exhibit 17 - Green correspondence w/ the IRS, #19 Exhibit 18 - Spencer and David Plummer's Cross Claim)(SCD) (Filed per #192 Order) Modified text on 1/8/2010 (STB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2010: #20 CORRECTED Fourth Amended Complaint) (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: 1) (186 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 1364 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Leave to File to File a Fourth Amended Complaint is GRANTED; 2) Clerk shall file the Tendered Fourth Amended Complaint in the record. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/13/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: It is ordered that Dfts' (115 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 1311 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 179 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 61 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 66 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 63 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED and that the discovery deadline in 07-348, 08-17, 08-74, 08-487 and 08-496 be extended to 11/15/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/10/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 10, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 11/15/2009, per 1439 Order in 07-353. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 AMENDED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Governing the production and distribution of materials containing confidential information and/or trade secrets. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/6/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DEADLINES: Disclosing experts extended to 11/30/2009; Disclosing rebuttal experts extended to 1/15/2010; Completing expert discovery extended to 2/28/2010; All other existing scheduling deadlines remain unaffected by this Agreed Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/30/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 22, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (59 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 192 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 310 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 1379 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 67 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 440 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 59 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 77 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 167 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 205 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 188 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 150 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 70 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 21, 2009 Filing 188 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Expert Deadlines by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Thomas Bissmeyer, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, C. Edward Cunningham, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Gastar Exploration Ltd, GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Tony Ferguson, Thomas Robinson, John Parrott, David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) Modified to add dfts as filers on 9/22/2009 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 21, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (154 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 143 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 90 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 59 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 282 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 64 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 47 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 199 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 184 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1274 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 177 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 113 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 433 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 117 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 61 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 18, 2009 Filing 187 REPLY to (154 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 143 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 90 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 59 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 282 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 64 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 47 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 199 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 184 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1274 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 177 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 113 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 433 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 117 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 61 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) The MDL Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants GeoStar Financial Service Corp. and First Source Wyoming, Inc. filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Norman, Medrith) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 16, 2009 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint with Memorandum in Support by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit 1 - Marketing Memo, #3 Exhibit 2 - 9/9/04 Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit 3 - 10/30/03 Letter of Intent, #5 Exhibit 4 - FEEP letter converting mare lease interests, #6 Exhibit 5 - Sample financial breakdown, #7 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Cashier's check for, #8 Exhibit 7 - Confirmation of receipt of funds from Classicstar, #9 Exhibit 8, Part 1 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, Lessor's Consent and Promissory Note, #10 Exhibit 8, Part 2 - 12/19/03 Security Agreement, Assignment, Lessor's Consent and Primissory Note, #11 Exhibit 9 - Payment for participating in Program, #12 Exhibit 12/31/03 letters confirming receipt of payments from NELC, #13 Exhibit 11 - Program Agreements, #14 Exhibit 12 - Illustration concerning conversion and put option, #15 Exhibit 13 - 2003 Income & Expense Summary, #16 Exhibit IRS Refund checks, #17 Exhibit 15 - 6/11/04 wire confirmation & ltr confirming wire transfer from NELC, #18 Exhibit 16 - letter from Classicstar regarding insurance policy, #19 Exhibit 17 - Green correspondence with the IRS, #20 Exhibit 18 - Spencer and David Plummer's Cross Claim, #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Clausen, Judy) Modified to add text on 9/17/2009 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER/MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/8/2009, before Magistrate Judge James B Todd (All Track I Cases): If Dfts wish to maintain their objections, it is ordered 1) Dfts Geostar Corporation, Thom Robinson, John Parrott, and Tony Ferguson shall advise Plas that they will do so, necessitating a Motion to Compel, w/in 7 days of entry of this order; 2) Any Motion to Compel shall be filed by the West Hills Plas w/in 10 days after notification by counsel for Dfts as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Todd. (Court Reporter None.) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al. (SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 9, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (175 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 150 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 1247 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 279 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 140 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 9, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1330 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 77 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (1335 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 183 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, (162 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 1334 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 8, 2009 Filing 184 REPLY to (175 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 150 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 279 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 140 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 1247 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) In Support of Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Regarding Settlement and Arbitration filed by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 8, 2009 Filing 183 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Amended Agreed Protective Order by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thomas Robinson, Terry L. Green, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 8, 2009 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re (154 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 143 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 90 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 59 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 282 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 64 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 47 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 199 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 184 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1274 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 177 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 113 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 433 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 117 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 61 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, I filed by GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, First Source Wyoming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER (All Track I Cases): 1) 1234 in 07-353, 430 in 06-243, #180 in 07-347, #274 in 08-53, #112 in 08-79 Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and to Quash Deposition Notices is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) 1233 in 07-353, 429 in 06-243, #179 in 07-347, #273 in 08-53, #111 in 08-79 Motion for Expedited Consideration of its Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and to Quash Deposition Notices is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Only as to those Dfts brought into the Track I cases for the first time after 12/2/2008 discovery deadlines are EXTENDED as follows, a) Fact discovery completed by 1/4/2010, b) Expert reports due by 2/26/2010, c) Rebuttal expert reports due by 3/30/2010, d) All expert discovery by 4/30/2010; 4) All DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS in Track I cases shall be filed on or before 5/28/2010. This portion of the order applies to ALL PARTIES in Track I cases. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/2/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER: It is ordered that any responses to 1131 in 07-353, #179 in 08-348, #63 in 08-17, #61 in 08-74, #66 08-487, and #115 in 08-496 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline shall be filed on or before 9/8/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/2/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 1, 2009 Filing 179 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson re: Premiere Thoroughbreds, Dumar Horses, McNeill, Tillotson and Fortenbaugh actions (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 22, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE OF FILING by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC re (154 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 53 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 143 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 90 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 59 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 282 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 64 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 47 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 199 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 184 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1274 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 177 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 113 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 433 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 117 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 61 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, I The MDL Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit A to The MDL Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar Financial Services Corp. and First Source Wyoming Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - Corrected Notice of Taking Deposition of Person Most Knowledgeable at GeoStar Financial Services Corporation Under Rule 30(B)(6), #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - Cross Notice of Deposition of GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 - Fortenbaugh Plaintiffs' Cross-Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of First Source Wyoming, Inc.)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 21, 2009 Filing 177 FIRST MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Thomas Bissmeyer, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, AA-J Breeding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - to MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - to MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 - to MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: 1160 in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 415 in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, #164 in case 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, #167 in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, #186 in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, #81 in case 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, #92 in case 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, #132 in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, #52 in case 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, #43 in case 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, #246 in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, #44 in case 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, #51 in case 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, #98 in case 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, #45 in case 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, #141 in case 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, #141 in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH; #39 in case 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, #52 in case 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, #102 in case 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, #22 in case 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, #95 in case 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, #28 in case 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, #16 in case 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 12, 2009 Filing 175 MOTION to Compel by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Regarding Settlement and Arbitration Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Regarding Settlement and Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Jason W. Crowell In Support of Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Regarding Settlement and Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jason W. Crowell (Copy of Defendants' Master List of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Propounded to Plaintiffs), #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jason W. Crowell (Copy of Responses of the Baker Plaintiffs), #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jason W. Crowell (Copy of Responses of the Goyak Plaintiffs), #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Jason W. Crowell (Copy of Responses of the Premiere Thoroughbreds Plaintiffs), #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Regarding Settlement and Arbitration)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 5:08-cv-00321-JMH(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 3, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1127 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 136 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 236 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 127 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 50 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 405 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 134 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 158 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 180 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 50 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 96 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 87 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 41 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 76 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 162 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 49 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 37 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH) FIRST MOTION for Joinder by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER (re: All Track I Cases): 1) Dfts Plummer and Strategic Opportunity Solutions shall file any Motion to Compel the settlement agreements w/in 10 days of entry of this Order; 2) Responses/Replies thereto shall be submitted in keeping w/ the Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 7/30/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 24, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 23, 2009 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson filed by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 22, 2009 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Support re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 13 in 5:08-cv-00103-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 36 in 5:07-cv-00350-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 35 in 5:07-cv-00281-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 46 in 5:08-cv-00373-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson filed by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 21, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 350 in 07-353 & #78 in 07-348 Motion to Dismiss; 358 in 07-353 & #80 in 07-348 Motion to Dismiss; 366 in 07-353 & #77 in 07-349 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 390 in 07-353 & #31 in 07-419 Motion to Dismiss; 394 in 07-353 & #32 in 07-419 Motion to Dismiss; 516 in 07-353 Motion for Joinder. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 5:07-cv-00419-JMH(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 20, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION for Joinder, (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) MOTION for Joinder. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 17, 2009 Filing 171 REPLY to (39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH), (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) In Support of S. David Plummer II, Spencer D. Plummer III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch and Zeus Investments, LLC's Limited Joinder In the MDL Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions Against GeoStar, and Request For Additional Sanctions filed by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Investments, LLC, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER/MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2009, before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: 1) Parties shall continue to negotiate and attempt to fashion an acceptable agreement concerning confidentiality and production of the settlement agreements through 7/28/2009. If no resolution, contact undersigned for further instructions; 2) Wilmington Trust shall submit an informal letter brief to undersigned, w/ copies to COR in Track I cases, outlining its argments against disclosure to counsel or parties outside Track I cases at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Todd. (Court Reporter None.) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al. (SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE: It is ordered that Plas shall file a Response to 1160 Motion to Stay w/in 5 days of entry of this Order; It is further ordered that Dfts shall file a Reply in support of their 1160 Motion to Stay w/in 2 days of Plas' Response. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/15/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 14, 2009 Filing 168 MOTION to Expedite by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 14, 2009 Filing 167 MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Goyak Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents to First Source Wyoming, Inc., #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 14, 2009 Filing 166 FIRST MOTION to Strike (1146 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) REPLY by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 13, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 8, 2009 Sealed Document S-165. (MAA)
July 6, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) MOTION to Compel by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, II, (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH) MOTION to Compel by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer Motion of S. David Plummer to Compel Production of Audit Report, (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, II UNDER SEAL Reply In Support of Defendants S. David Plummer's Motion to Compel Production of Audit Report Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 3, 2009 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re (222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve, (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) MOTION for Joinder by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer filed by GeoStar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - George Hofmeister Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Lee Brower Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Toby Norton Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Exhibit 188 to Carol Shrives Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail from Green to Plummer (part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit E - E-mail from Green to Plummer (part 2 of 2), #7 Exhibit F - E-mail from Plummer to Ferguson, #8 Exhibit G - Buffalo Ranch Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #9 Exhibit H - Byron Dyson Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #10 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 30, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (36 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 116 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 141 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 62 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 34 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 216 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 169 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1061 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 65 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 120 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 151 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 42 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 385 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions, (973 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 48 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 29, 2009 Filing 162 FIRST MOTION for Joinder by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, Gunshy Thoroughbreds, LLC, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Peter Fortenbaugh, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Ginaldi Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 29, 2009 Filing 161 REPLY to (36 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 116 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 141 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 62 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 34 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 216 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 169 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1061 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 65 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 120 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 151 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 42 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 385 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH), (145 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1079 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 67 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 390 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, Gunshy Thoroughbreds, LLC, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Ginaldi Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 29, 2009 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion re (36 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 116 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 141 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 62 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 34 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 216 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 169 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1061 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 65 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 120 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 151 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 42 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 385 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, Gunshy Thoroughbreds, LLC, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Ginaldi Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: 1) Above-styled actions are NO LONGER STAYED with regard to ClassicStar, L.L.C.; 2) These actions with regards to ClassicStar, L.L.C., are RETURNED to the active docket of the Court; 3) Clerk shall no longer file that order directing that these actions be stayed w/ regard to ClassicStar, LLC, in the record of additional cases filed, removed or transferred hereto that are related to the ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/22/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 19, 2009 Sealed Document S-158. (MAA)
June 19, 2009 Filing 157 NOTICE OF FILING by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson re (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer Motion of S. David Plummer to Compel Production of Audit Report Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 19, 2009 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING Order Lifting Stay as to ClassicStar by AA-J Breeding, LLC, Arbor Farms, Anne Baker, Neil Baker, Harriet V. Barker, Beechglen Farms, Thomas Bissmeyer, Bissmeyer Properties, C. Edward Cunningham, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Derby Stakes, LLC, Dumar Horses, L.C., Peter Fortenbaugh, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Dana Goyak, John Goyak, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Donna Hacker, John Hales, Ora-Oli Halfon, Uri Halfon, Jean Hertzog, Leo Hertzog, Beverly House-Myers, J&L Canterbury Farms, LLC, JKLM Ranches, LLC, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Betty Lee, James D. Lyon, MacDonald Stables LLC, Larry McNeill, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Mark Myers, Nebann Farms, LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, No Limits Productions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Rezie Farms, LLC, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, Julie Romanowski, William Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Sea Song Farms, LLC, Errol Skinner, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Ralph Tamm, Linda T. Teffeau, Linda S. Teffeau, Sandra N. Tillotson, Janice Webb, Steven Webb, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, West Hills Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, Zeus Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Judge Howard's January 3, 2008 Order, #2 Exhibit B - Judge Howard's March 16, 2009 Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) Modified to add descriptive text and to correct the filers on 6/22/2009 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 16, 2009 Sealed Document S-155. (MAA)
June 16, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING by GeoStar Corporation re (76 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Filed Under Seal Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 15, 2009 Filing 153 MOTION for Joinder (re: 1061 in 5:07-cv-353-JMH, #151 in 5:07-cv-348-JMH) by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Investments, LLC, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support OF S DAVID PLUMMER II, SPENCER D PLUMMER III, STRATEGIC OPPORTUNITY SOLUTIONS, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH, AND ZEUS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S LIMITED JOINDER IN THE MDL PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST GEOSTAR [DE #1061], AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL SANCTION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION OF S DAVID PLUMMER II, SPENCER D PLUMMER III, STRATEGIC OPPORTUNITY SOLUTIONS, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH, AND ZEUS INVESTMENTS, LLC FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST GEOSTAR)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) Modified to create link to related document on 6/16/2009 (Dawkins, Susan). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 1, 2009 Filing 152 MOTION to Compel Production of Audit Report by S. David Plummer. Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of J. Ronald Sim, #3 Proposed Order) (Filed pursuant to QC re: DE 1065 in 5:07-cv-353-JMH)(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 29, 2009 Filing 151 MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, Gunshy Thoroughbreds, LLC, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Betty Lee, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Zeus Investments, LLC, Ginaldi Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Betty Lee The MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of the MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar FILELD UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 1014 in 07-353 and #198 in 08-53 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED; 2) 1015 Duplicate Motion for Joinder is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Dft GeoStar Corporation's 1005 in 07-353 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 4) GeoStar shall have no obligations to provide a designee informed of GeoStar's current financial condition and the current location of its assets; 5) This order does not relieve GeoStar of any other discovery obligations. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/12/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: It is ordered that any response (to DE 1005 Motion for Protective Order) be filed on or before 5/12/2009 at 9:00 AM. Any reply be filed on or before 5/12/2009 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/11/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 8, 2009 Filing 148 MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Restricting Scope of Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of GeoStar Corporation, #3 Exhibit B - GeoStar's Objections to 30(b)(6) Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Response to GeoStar's Objections, #5 Exhibit D - Additional 30(b)(6) Topics, #6 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: 1) 901 in 07-353 and 339 in 06-243 Motion to Compel Discovery and Compliance with the Court's 2/2/2009 Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) 921 in 07-353, 343 in 06-243, #128 in 07-347, #145 in 07-348, #149 in 07-349, #59 in 07-351, #72 in 07-352, #108 in 07-419, #36 in 08-17, #172 in 08-53, #35 in 08-74, #45 in 08-79, #30 in 08-104, #114 in 08-109, #97 in 08-321; #24 in 08-418, #36 in 08-487, #72 in 08-496, #54 in 09-15 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 3) GeoStar shall produce the requested financial data except as otherwise provided in this Order through December 31, 2008; 4) If Plas believe that there is reasonable cause that documents/information from after 12/31/2008 would be relevant, seek relief from Court and file a formal pleading; 5) GeoStar shall produce financial data for VCR's inception in 2005 through May 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 4/15/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 7, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 6, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE OF FILING by Geo Star Corporation re (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 6, 2009 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Brian Johnson re (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation; Error: Attached Memorandum in Support does not pertain to this Motion; Entry by attorney; Attorney shall prepare a pleading entitled Notice of Filing (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the correct memorandum in support, and create a link to the related docket entry within 3 business days. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 3, 2009 Filing 145 MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER (re: 07-cv-353 DE 863 ; 06-cv-243 DE 324 ; 07-cv-347 DE #120 ; 07-cv-348 DE #141 ; 07-cv-349 DE #140 ; 07-cv-351 DE #55 ; 07-cv-352 DE #68 ; 07-cv-419 DE #103 ; 5:08-cv-18 DE #34 ; 07-cv-53 DE #154 ; 07-cv-109 DE #110 ; 07-cv-321 DE #89 ): It is hereby ordered that John R. Tarter and the law firm Mapother & Mapther, PSC, are relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff-Intervenor Travelors Casualty and Surety Company of America and further that they shall be removed from all service lists and from receipt of notice through this Court's CM/ECF system of future filings in this matter. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/27/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 26, 2009 Filing 143 NOTICE to Electronic Filing Users re: filing in related cases by Clerk. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER/MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2009, before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: It is ordered that Plas are given leave to file a Motion to Compel the production of data on or before 3/27/2009. Dft GeoStar Corporation file any response accompanied by a Motion for Protective Order on or before 4/3/2009. Plas make any reply on or before 4/10/2009. (SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 13, 2009 Filing 141 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America filed by Mapother & Mapother, PSC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal)(Tarter, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 26, 2009 Attorney Update. Attorney John R. Tarter; C. Edward Craft and Dennis M. Dolan terminated. (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: #106 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009. (STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) #127 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp. is DENIED; (2) West Hills Plts shall bear reasonable cost to GeoStar of copying & delivering data to counsel for West Hills; (3) By 2/12/2009, GeoStar shall provide West Hills good-faith estimate of reasonable cost of copying & delivering data; (4) By 2/17/2009, West Hills shall notify GeoStar whether it wishes GeoStar to proceed to produce data based on estimate; (5) GeoStar shall PRODUCE requested financial data in native format to West Hills by 3/4/2009; (6) GeoStar shall be relieved of obligation to timely produce data only if West Hills advise GeoStar they do not wish to proceed w/ production as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, (1) #112 FIRST MOTION to Intervene by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and to Interplead is DENIED; (2) #113 FIRST MOTION to Deposit Funds by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/22/2009.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 9, 2009 Filing 137 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to National Equine Lending Co. cc: COR (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 9, 2009 Filing 136 NOTICE OF FILING by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor re #135 MOTION for Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 29, 2008 Filing 135 MOTION for Entry of Default by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant, National Equine Lending Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Judy Clausen)(Clausen, Judy) Modified to redefine motion as motion for entry of default rather than motion for default judgment on 12/30/2008 (STB). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Clerk shall file Mtn for Reconsideration in 08-17, 08-18, 08-60, 08-74, 08-79, 08-104, 08-373, 08-418, 08-487 & 08-496; (2) #133 MOTION for Reconsideration re #131 Order, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/23/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 22, 2008 Filing 133 MOTION for Reconsideration re #131 Order,,, by Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: (1) initial disclosures due within 10 days; (2) Amended pleadings & motions to join parties due by 2/1/2009; (3) Discovery due by 9/1/2009; (4) expert reports where party bears burden of proof due by 10/30/2009; rebuttal expert reports due by 12/14/2009; (5) expert discovery due by 1/29/2010; (6) Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2010; (7) REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Todd for expedited settlement processes; (8) this order shall apply to all cases proceeding in Track I & entered by Clerk in records thereof. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/8/2008(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: (1) Barry Hunter appointed Plts' liaison counsel; Brian Johnson appointed Dfts' liaison counsel; counsel to work together to facilitate prompt & orderly discovery; (2) parties directed to coordinate all discovery through respective liaison counsel; (3) discovery disputes referred to Magistrate Judge Todd; (4) Court will assume jurisdiction over all disputes re subpoenas served on third parties outside this District; (5) By 1/10/09, Plts shall submit to Dfts list of witnesses to depose; By 1/15/09, Dfts shall submit list of witnesses who will assert Fifth Amendment privilege; (6) filing declaration sufficient to trigger presumption that would attach; (7) After 1/15/09, witness may only change mind & elect to testify upon showing of good cause; (8) consolidated cases shall proceed on 2 tracks (1) for those transferred by 1/2/2008 (Track I) & (2) for all other subsequently transferred (Track II). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/8/08.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER re #129 Motion to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at December 2, 2008 Status Conference, or Excuse Appearance by Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor (1) said motion is GRANTED and counsel is excused from appearing. Counsel and Plfs Greg and Stephanie Minor and Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, shall be bound by any deadlines established. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/2/08. (MB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 2, 2008 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Motion to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at December 2, 2008 Status Conference, or Excuse Appearance Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 2, 2008 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #128 Status Report, (MB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 1, 2008 Filing 128 STATUS REPORT by Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 30(b)(6) Notice to GeoStar, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena of First Source Wyoming, #3 Exhibit C - E-mail regarding deposition scheduling, #4 Exhibit D - Thomson Deposition Excerpts)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 24, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Todd for review: #127 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp. (MB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 21, 2008 Filing 127 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp. Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Brian Johnson, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Johnson 2-5-08 E-mail, #4 Exhibit B - Thatcher 2-12-08 E-mail, #5 Exhibit C - Lambert Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit D - West Hills 30(b)(6) Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER (re: ALL CASES) The motion for Status Conference #124 is GRANTED; and (2) this matter is set for a status conference on 12/2/2008 at 1:00 PM in Lexington before Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/19/08.(MB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/14/2008 before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: Dft GeoStar shall produce financial info & data as requested & previously ordered in native format w/in 30 days of 11/14/2008; Dft GeoStar has leave to file any motion for protective order by 11/21/2008; responses due 12/2/2008 & replies due 12/5/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 11/14/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 14, 2008 Filing 124 JOINT MOTION for Hearing by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, S. David Plummer, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, Spencer D. Plummer, III Motion for Status Conference Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 4, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. of Legal Name Change (Tomlin, Amanda) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dennis M. Dolan and Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. Edward Craft (Motions filed in 5:07-cv-353) GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/31/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 30, 2008 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 FIRST MOTION to Intervene by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and to Interplead filed b S. David & Spencer Plummer filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Tarter, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2008 before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: (1) By 10/30/2008, Geostar shall inform parties whether it agrees to produce requested witnesses on 11/17/2008; (2) if Geostar declines, West Hills Plts shall file Motion to Compel by 10/31/2008; (3) Geostar shall file response w/in 10 days; (4) any other parties shall also file w/in 10 days; (5) West Hills Farms Plts shall file Reply w/in 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Todd.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Request by Plts Goyak to strike certain proposed orders is DENIED: (2) Plt West Hills' Mtn for Status Conference is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) Geostar's #103 Mtn for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART; (4) depos of Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not scheduled prior to 12/1/2008; (5) Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not required to respond to interrogatories or requests for admission prior to 12/1/2008, but shall serve responses to all timely served discovery requests by 12/1/2008; (6) that all other permitted discovery shall proceed unless otherwise made subject of an order of this Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 20, 2008 Filing 118 RESPONSE to #113 , #112 Travelers motion to intervene and motion for interpleader filed by James D. Lyon. (Morgan, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 17, 2008 Filing 117 RESPONSE to #113 filed by S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer In Opposition to Travelers Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Stake filed by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II. (Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 17, 2008 Filing 116 RESPONSE to #112 filed by S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer In Opposition to Travelers Motion for Leave to Intervene and File Complaint for Interpleader filed by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II. (Sim, J.)[Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 17, 2008 Filing 115 RESPONSE to #113 , #112 filed by Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson. (Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 7, 2008 Attorney Update. Attorney Jennifer Cave Artiss for Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC and Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. added. (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 6, 2008 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Trent Ams on behalf of ClassicStar Farms, Inc., Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. and Notice of Appearance by Jennifer C. Artiss (Ams, Jason) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 29, 2008 Filing 113 FIRST MOTION to Deposit Funds by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tarter, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 29, 2008 Filing 112 FIRST MOTION to Intervene by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and to Interplead (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Tarter, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 5, 2008 Attorney Update. Attorney Sherryll M. Dunaj and Robert Michael Klein terminated. (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER: #110 Motion for counsel for Schiellack Dfts to be removed from service list is GRANTED; Clerk shall remove R. Klein & S. Dunaj from service list. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/4/2008. (STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
September 4, 2008 Filing 110 MOTION for Order by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates Counsel for Removal from Service List (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER (1) Plts' claims against Dwayne Schiellack and Schiellack & Associates DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear own atty fees & costs; (2) Dfts' #77 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/29/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 28, 2008 Filing 108 STIPULATION Dropping Parties and Dismissing Claims with Prejudice and Joint Motion by Stephanie Minor, Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Dropping Parties with Prejudice and Dismissing Claims with Prejudice)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 19, 2008 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson Plummer Defendants Opposition In Part To GeoStar Motion For Protective Order filed by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email chain between Ron Sim and Brian Johnson re Deposition of Frank Lambert, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between Ron Sim and Brian Johnson requesting update on Schedule for Lambert Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Email chain between Ron Sim and Brian Johnson re Depositions of Byron Dyson and Bill Bolles, #4 Exhibit D - Email chain between Ron Sim and Brian Johnson emphasizing Johnsons email dated 08/04/08, #5 Exhibit E - Email dated 08/04/08 from Ron Sim to ClassicStar Counsel; Notices of Depositions of Byron Dyson and William Bolles; and ClassicStar Section 400 Summary for 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004 and 2005)(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 19, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp. to Preserve Its Attorney-Client Privilege Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - West Hills Response in Support of Motion to Convert, #3 Exhibit B - Report of Disputed Trustee Election, #4 Exhibit C - Subpoena to Great American Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit D - Johnson Letter to Counsel dated April 1, 2008, #6 Exhibit E - Thatcher Letter to Johnson dated July 14, 2008, #7 Exhibit F - Johnson Letter to Thatcher dated July 18, 2008, #8 Exhibit G - Trustee Letter to Edelman dated July 30, 2008, #9 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED ORDER: (1) MOTION to Clarify is GRANTED; (2) GeoStar to produce all docs related to transfers of value made for benefit of ClassicStar; if docs previously produced, GeoStar shall identify by Bates Number; GeoStar shall produce all financial statements and info re financial conditions of GeoStar from 2001 to present; (3) Hertzog Plts & other plts who have asserted claims against Handler Thayer & who are waiving atty/client privilege shall provide written waiver w/in 7 days; (4) Handler Thayer's ordered production of docs may include production of GeoStar docs that will need to be reviewed by GeoStar to determine if docs are exempt from production; (5) Order of 8/14/08 which references Scheduling Order of 11/27/08 is AMENDED to refer to Scheduling Order of 11/27/07. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 8/19/08.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re telephone conference held 8/12/2008: (1) West Hills Plts shall FILE Motion to Compel Response to Discovery from Geostar Corporation in record as attachment to Notice of Filing by 8/15/08; (2) West Hills Plts Motion to Compel Response to Discovery from Geostar Corporation is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (3) Dft Geostar Corporation shall IDENTIFY to parties every bank account; (4) Geostar shall PRODUCE parties all docs re transfers of anything of value by GeoStar; (5) Geostar shall IDENTIFY docs by Bates Number to counsel for all parties; (6) GeoStar shall PRODUCE all financial statements & info, general ledgers, accounting journal entries & source documents, re financial condition ofGeoStar from 2001 to present w/in 30 days; (7) Motion to Expedite by Nelson Breeders, LLC, MacDonald Stables, LLC, Jaswinder & Monica Grover, West Hills Farms, LLC, & Arbor Farms, LLC GRANTED & parties Motion for Status Conference remains pending; (8) responses & objections to Motion for Protective Order by GeoStar, Ferguson, Robinson, & Parrott due 7 days from 8/12/08; Movants shall have 5 days to make reply; (9) Geostar shall PRODUCE ClassicStar server & any copies to parties; (10) GeoStar shall file any motion for protective order re info on ClassicStar server w/in 7 days; response or objection due 7 days from filing of motion, reply due 5 days thereafter; (11) Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC, shall PRODUCE all docs not subject to privilege & otherwise responsive to West Hills Plts discovery requests &/or a privilege log by 9/15/2008; (12) Karren Hendrix & Associates shall PRODUCE relevant financial info generated, prepared, or received in electronic format in original electronic format w/in 30 days of 8/12/2008; (13) motions for protective order re financial info generated, prepared, or received in electronic format shall be FILED w/in 7 days of 8/12/2008; response due 7 days thereafter, reply due 5 days after response; (14) for discovery disputes, parties shall proceed in accordance w/ Para 1 of 11/27/2007 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 8/14/2008.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 14, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to GeoStar Corporation, #3 Exhibit 2 - Document Requests to GeoStar Corporation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notices of Deposition of Dyson and Bolles, #5 Exhibit 4 - Requests for Admission to Ferguson, #6 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 14, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE of Change of Address by Niels P. Murphy (Murphy, Niels) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: (1) #100 Motion to Seal is DENIED; (2) Dfts shall electronically file their Motion for Protective Order in record by 8/15/2008 if they desire the Court to consider it further. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/13/2008. (STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 12, 2008 Filing 100 MOTION to Seal by Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
August 7, 2008 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 28, 2008 Attorney Update. Attorney George Edward Henry, II and Kara Read Marino terminated. (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: (1) #91 Motion to Substitute Attorney, Motion to Substitute Party is SUSTAINED; (2) John O. Morgan, Jr. is substituted for ClassicStar, LLC and James D. Lyon, Trustee for Estate of ClassicStar, LLC; G. Edward Henry, II, Kara Read Marino and Henry Watz Gardner & Sellars, PLLC are terminated as counsel of record for ClassicStar, LLC; (3) Clerk to note on docket change in real party in interest of Dft ClassicStar, LLC to James D. Lyon, Trustee for Estate of ClassicStar, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/24/2008. (STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING plas Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor & Stephanie Minor's #94 Motion for Extension of Time; pla's have until 8/8/08 to file a response to dft Schiellack & Schiellack & Assoc's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/24/08. (KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AGREED ORDER that ClassicStar Farms, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, GeoStar Corp, GeoStar Equine Energy, Tony Ferguson, Thom Robinson & John Parrot have until 7/14/08 to file their reply to their #78 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/24/08.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 14, 2008 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. filed by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc.. (Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 10, 2008 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Stipulated Motion for Enlargment of Time Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
July 3, 2008 Filing 93 REPLY to #80 , #90 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC. (Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 27, 2008 Filing 92 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Stephanie Minor, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 26, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by ClassicStar, LLC and, MOTION to Substitute Party by ClassicStar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order June 13, 2008, #2 Proposed Order)(Henry, George) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 19, 2008 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #80 MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Strategic Opportunity Solutions LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
June 17, 2008 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC,Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Response to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants ClassicStar, et al. filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 30, 2008 Filing 88 ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, by Terry L. Green.(Irvin, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 27, 2008 Filing 87 ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co..(Brockmann, Amanda) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #83 Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Stipulation Motion for Enlargement of Time: The motion is GRANTED and Plfs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor shall have up to and including 6/20/08 to respond to Dft Buffalo Ranch's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/27/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #82 Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Stipulation Motion for Enlargement of Time: The motion is GRANTED and Plfs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor shall have up to and including 6/26/08 to respond to Dfts Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/27/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #81 Plaintiffs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor's Stipulation Motion for Enlargement of Time: The motion is GRANTED and Plfs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor shall have up to and including 6/17/08 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss of Dfts ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/27/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 27, 2008 ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #78 MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, #82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #77 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 23, 2008 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified on 5/27/2008 to delete referral text (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 23, 2008 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #77 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified on 5/27/2008 to delete referral text (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 23, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #78 MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified on 5/27/2008 to delete referral text (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 15, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 15, 2008 Filing 79 JOINT ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, Second Amended Complaint by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 12, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
May 12, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER (1) the parties' motion [Lexington Civil Action No. 07-cv-353, Record No. 317] is GRANTED; (2) the 11/27/07 scheduling order is AMENDED; (3) all fact discovery due 3/2/09; (4) expert reports on issues where a party bears the burden of proof due 3/16/09; rebuttal reports due 5/1/09, supplemental reports due pursuant to Rule 26(2); (5) all expert discovery due 6/15/09; (6) all dispositive motions due 7/15/09; (7) discovery disputes remain REFERRED to MJ Todd; (8) if parties desire to participate in expedited settlement processes, they shall advise MJ Todd; this matter remains REFERRED to MJ Todd for such expedited settlement processes; (9) parties shall continue to coordinate written discovery and submit, whenever possible, Master Lists of Plfs' and Dfts' written discovery, between themselves; and (10) depositions shall continue to be coordinated by all counsel, with all parties having mutual interest in a deposition to coordinate questioning and to declare, prior to deposition, the estimated amount of time that they require.Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/28/08.(JMW)cc: COR,JBT [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2008 Filing 75 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, New NEL, LLC, National Equine Lending Co., Geostar Corp., Terry L. Green, Tony P. Ferguson, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., S. David Plummer, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Dwayne Schiellack, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC, First Equine Energy Partners, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC, Thomas J. Handler, Thomas J. Handler, J.D. P.C., Schiellack & Associates, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Does, filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 - Promotional Materials Distributed at Retired Players Assn meeting, #2 Exh 2 - Bill of Sale, #3 Exh 3 - 2003 Letter of Intent, #4 Exh 4 - July 12 2004 letter, #5 Exh 5 - Early illustration Dec 19 2003, #6 Exh 6 - Copy of Oct 31 2003 cashier's check, #7 Exh 7 - Nov 3 2003 confirmation of receipt of funds, #8 8 Part 1 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #9 Exh 8 Part 2 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #10 Exh 9 - Jan 5 2004 ltr confirming receipt of funds, #11 Exh 10 - Dec 31 2003 ltrs confirming receipt of funds from NELC, #12 Exh 11 - Foal Mare Lease Boarding & Nominee Agreements, #13 Exh 12 - June 8 2004 conversion document, #14 Exh 13 - 2003 Income/Expense Summary, #15 Exh 14 - Copies of IRS refund checks, #16 Exh 15 - June 11 2004 wire confirmation receipt, #17 Exh 16 - info regarding foal insurance for IRS, #18 Exh 17 - Jan 20 2005 ltr sent by Terry Green to IRS agent, #19 Exh 18 - Cross-Claims against ClassicStar LLC and Geostar Corp)(JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER (1) Plfs' motion for leave to withdraw motions #68 is GRANTED and Plfs' motion for leave to amend complaint #57 and second motion for leave to amend complaint and to add parties #66 are deemed WITHDRAWN; (2) Plfs' motion for leave to amend the first amended complaint and to add additional parties #69 is GRANTED and the second amended complaint and related exhibits tendered herewith shall be FILED by the clerk in the record of this matter; (3) Dfts Dwayne Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint #33 is DENIED AS MOOT; (4) the joint motion to dismiss the first amended complaint by ClassicStar, LLC, ClassisStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, and Thomas E. Robinson #28 is DENIED AS MOOT; (5) the motion to dismiss the first amended complaint filed by S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer, III #31 , is DENIED AS MOOT; (6) Plfs' motion for extension of time to respond to motions to dismiss #56 is DENIED AS MOOT; and (7) Dfts Dwayne Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' motion for extension of time to file reply #71 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/28/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER to govern the anticipated production of materials containing confidential information and/or trade secrets re #72 MOTION for Order by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order filed by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/14/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 14, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #72 MOTION for Order by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 11, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION for Order by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 10, 2008 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 10, 2008 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint and to Add Additional Parties, #66 SECOND MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Add Parties Non-Objection filed by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates. (Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #68 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motions (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 4, 2008 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Judy Clausen re #67 Response in Opposition to Motion; Error: Signature on document and filer do not match; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is submitted must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action is required by counsel regarding this pleading. cc: COR (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 3, 2008 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint and to Add Additional Parties Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint and Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 - Promotional Materials Distributed at Retired Players Assn meetings, #3 Exhibit Exh 2 - Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit Exh 3 - 2003 Letter of Intent, #5 Exhibit Exh 4 - July 12 2004 letter, #6 Exhibit Exh 5 - Early illustration Dec 19 2003, #7 Exhibit Exh 6 - Copy of Oct 31 2003 cashier's check, #8 Exhibit Exh 7 - Nov 3 2003 confirmation of receipt of funds, #9 Exhibit Exh 8 Part 1 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #10 Exhibit Exh 8 Part 2 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #11 Exhibit Exh 9 - Jan 5 2004 ltr confirming receipt of funds, #12 Exhibit Exh 10 - Dec 31 2003 ltrs confirming receipt of funds from NELC, #13 Exhibit Exh 11 - Foal Mare Lease Boarding & Nominee Agreements, #14 Exhibit Exh 13 - 2003 Income/Expense Summary, #15 Exhibit Exh 14 - Copies of IRS refund checks, #16 Exhibit Exh 12 - June 8 2004 conversion document, #17 Exhibit Exh 15 - June 11 2004 wire confirmation receipt, #18 Exhibit Exh 16 - info regarding foal insurance for IRS, #19 Exhibit Exh 17 - Jan 20 2005 ltr sent by Terry Green to IRS agent, #20 Exhibit Exh 18 - Cross-Claims against ClassicStar LLC and Geostar Corp, #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 3, 2008 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified on 4/4/2008 to delete referral text (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 3, 2008 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephanie Minor)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 2, 2008 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Judy Clausen re #66 SECOND MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Add Parties; Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion; Attorney shall prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice in this action as well as in the Master File 07-cv-353 using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry within 3 business days. cc: COR (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
April 1, 2008 Filing 66 SECOND MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Add Parties Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Promotional Materials Distributed at Retired Players Assn Meetings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2003 letter of intent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - July 12, 2004 letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Early Illustration Dec 19 2003, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Copy of Oct 31, 2003 cashier's check, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Nov 3, 2003 Confirmation of Receipt of Funds, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 part 1 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 2 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Jan 5 2004 ltr confirming receipt of funds, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Dec 31, 2003 ltrs confirming receipt of funds from NELC, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Foal Mare Lease Boarding & Nominee Agreements, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - June 8 2004 conversion document, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - 2003 Income/Expense Summary, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Copies of IRS refund checks, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - June 11 2004 Wire Confirmation receipt, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Info regarding foal insurance for IRS, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Jan 20 2005 ltr sent by Terry Green to IRS agent, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Cross-Claims Against ClassicStar, LLC and Geostar Corp)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 24, 2008 Filing 65 ANSWER to #58 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Answer to Crossclaim,,,, by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 24, 2008 Filing 64 ANSWER to #58 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Answer to Crossclaim,,,, Of Plummers, Zeus and Buffalo Ranch by ClassicStar, LLC.(Henry, George) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 18, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates re #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates Supplemental Authorties in support of motion to dismiss on subject matter jurisdicational grounds (Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 18, 2008 Filing 62 NOTICE by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates re #57 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor to Amend Complaint (no objection to motion) (Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 18, 2008 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor to Amend Complaint filed by ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER (1) Schiellack Dfts' Motion to Sever Separable Claims and to Transfer to Transferee Court 07-cv-348, No. #34 ; 07-cv-353 No. 108 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (2) Schiellack Dfts' Motion for Hearing on their Motion to Sever 07-cv-348, No. #33 ; 07-cv-353 No. 103 is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) upon the stipulation and agreement of Plfs and the Schiellack Dfts' 07-cv-348, No. #59 ; 07-cv-353 No. 261, Plfs shall have 20 days from the date of entry of this order to file a response to the Schiellack Dfts' Motion to Dismiss; and (4) the parties joint motion, by virtue of their stipulation, for continued CM/ECF Notification following Severance 07-cv-348, No. #59 ; 07-cv-353 No. 261 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/14/08.(JMW)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 14, 2008 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #59 Stipulation (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 13, 2008 Filing 59 STIPULATION re #30 MOTION for Hearing re #29 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates MOTION for Hearing re #29 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, #34 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates MOTION to Remand by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates MOTION for Order by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Stephanie Minor, Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Sever & Transfer (order #1), #2 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Dismiss (order #2), #3 Proposed Order Order Re CM/ECF (order #3))(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 4, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #56 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor to respond to Motions to Dismiss (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 3, 2008 Filing 58 JOINT ANSWER to #46 Crossclaim, Third Party Complaint,,, ANSWER to #46 Crossclaim, Third Party Complaint,,, CROSSCLAIM against ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, Zeus Investments, LLC.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 3, 2008 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor to filed Second Amend Complaint Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit 1 - Promotional Materials Distributed at Retired Players Assn Meetings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2003 letter of intent, #5 Exhibit 4 - July 12 2004 letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Early Illustration Dec 19 2003, #7 Exhibit 6 - copy of Oct 31, 2003 cashier's check, #8 Exhibit 7 - Nov 3, 2003 Confirmation of Receipt of Funds, #9 Exhibit 8 part 1 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #10 Exhibit 8 part 2 - Dec 19 2003 NELC documents, #11 Exhibit 9 - Jan 5 2004 ltr confirming receipt of funds, #12 Exhibit 10 - Dec 31, 2003 ltrs confirming receipt of funds from NELC, #13 Exhibit 11 - Foal Mare Lease Boarding & Nominee Agreements, #14 Exhibit 12 - June 8 2004 conversion document, #15 Exhibit 13 - 2003 Income/Expense summary, #16 Exhibit 14 - Copies of IRS refund checks, #17 Exhibit 15 - June 11 2004 Wire confirmation receipt, #18 Exhibit 16 - Info regarding foal insurance for IRS, #19 Exhibit 17 - Jan 20 2005 ltr sent by Terry Green to IRS agent, #20 Exhibit 18 - Cross-Claims Against ClassicStar, LLC and Geostar Corp)(Clausen, Judy) Modified by adding "to file Second" to text on 3/4/2008 (KJR). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 3, 2008 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor to respond to Motions to Dismiss Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #54 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion filed by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC (1) the motion is granted and Plfs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor shall have up to and including 3/13/08 to respond to Dfts Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Motion to Sever and Remand. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/3/08.(JMW)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
March 3, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #54 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 29, 2008 Filing 54 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Premiere Thoroughbreds, Greg Minor & Stephanie Minor's #52 MOTION for Extension of Time; that plas Premiere Thoroughbreds, Greg Minor & Stephanie Minor have until 3/3/08 to file a response to dfts GeoStar Corporation, ClassicStar Racing Stable, LLC, ClassicStar 2003 Racing Partnership, LLC, GeoStar Financial Financial Services Corp., Tony Ferguson's #28 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/21/08.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 21, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #52 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 20, 2008 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified on 2/21/2008 to delete referral text (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AGREED ORDER (1) By on or before 2/29/08, GeoStar will produce the following documents to the West Hills Plaintiffs: (a) All documents reflecting transfers between GeoStar, on the one hand, and ClassicStar NELC or Plummer, on the other; (b) All bank statements, including the record of the underlying items, for all accounts maintained by GeoStar from 1/1/04 to the present; (c) All documents responsive to Request Nos. 5,6,9 and 17 of Plfs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Rrequests for Production of Documents on GeoStar, which GeoStar responded to on 5/11/07; (d) Documents responsive to Interrogatory No. 2 of Plfs' Second Set of Interrogatories to GeoStar; with the understanding that Plfs reserve their right to move to compel an answer to that Interrogatory if it deems that the documents are not sufficiently responsive pursuant to Rule 33(c); (e) Documents responsive to Request for Production Nos. 4 and 15 to the extent that they pertain to the transfer of assets between the identified parties from January 2001 to the present; (f) Documents requested by the West Hills Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to GeoStar dated 6/14/07; and (2) Based on GeoStar's representation that it does not intend to generally refer to the ClassicStar or Plummer documents seized by the United States Government in the foregoing responses, the Court will not address at this time the issues raised by item D. of the West Hills Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/15/08.(JMW)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 14, 2008 Filing 50 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Terry L. Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Karren, Hendrix, Stagg, Allen & Co.) (Filed pursuant to QC re #186 in master file 07-353)(JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (1) any motions pending in the transferor courts not refiled in this Court are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (2) the Clerk is directed to serve this Order to counsel of record in the above cases and counsel in any additional case that may be filed, removed, or transferred hereto. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/14/08.(JMW)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 Filing 48 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Rule 26(a)(1) by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co..(Green, Ronald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #43 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC: The motion is granted and Plfs Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor and Stephanie Minor shall have up to and including 3/3/08 to respond to Dfts Schiellack and Schiellack and Associates' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Motion to Sever and Remand. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/8/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 Filing 46 JOINT CROSSCLAIMS against S. David Plummer, II, Zeus Investments, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, National Equine Lending Company, L.C., and THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, New NEL, LLC, filed by ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC, Geostar Corp. (Filed in the record pursuant to #45 Order).(JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #22 MOTION to Intervene by ClassicStar Farms, Inc. (1) the motion is GRANTED and ClassicStar Farms, Inc. is permitted to intervene in this action and file cross-claims and third-party complaint; and (2) the cross-claims and third-party complaint of ClassicStar Farms, Inc. shall be deemed filed and served as of the date hereof, the cross-claim defendants and third-party defendants already being before the Court in this multidistrict litigation. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/8/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates of compliance with Rule 26(A)(1)-(2), FED.R.CIV.P. and Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #43 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 7, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 141 (Filed in 07-353-JMH) FIRST MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry L. Green, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. (1) Clerk shall file a copy of said motion in Lexington Civil Action Nos. 06-243-JMH and 07-348-JMH; (2) the #41 motion is GRANTED; and (3) David W. Henry and the Law Firm of Allen, Dyer, Doppelt, Milbrath & Gilchrist, P.A., shall be STRICKEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD for Dfts Terry Green and Karren, Hendrix, Stagg, Allen & Co. in these matters. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/1/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2008 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #32 Crossclaim (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2008 Attorney Update. Attorney David W. Henry terminated. (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 31, 2008 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry L. Green, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. (Filed pursuant to Order No. 146 in Lexington Civil No. 07-353-JMH) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 31, 2008 Filing 40 ANSWER to #32 Crossclaim of Plummers and Buffalo Ranch by Geostar Corp..(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 31, 2008 Filing 39 ANSWER to #32 Crossclaim of Plummers by ClassicStar, LLC.(Henry, George) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #37 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (1) said motion is granted and Plfs shall have up to and including 2/22/08 to respond to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/30/08.(JMW)cc: COR,MDL [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2008 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #37 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor (JMW) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 29, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2008, to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clausen, Judy) Modified text on 1/30/2008 to further describe motion (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 14, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates re Notice of Deficiency,,, #30 MOTION for Hearing re #29 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates on motion for hearing and oral argument (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 14, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates re Notice of Deficiency,,, #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 14, 2008 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Sherryll Dunaj - (1) NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION re #29 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates; this motion requests 3 forms of relief; atty only selected 1 motion relief; clerk has refiled the pleading choosing all forms of relief requested at DE #34 ; in the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, atty should select a motion relief for each relief requested to allow all motions to appear on the Judge's motion report; no further action required; (2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #30 MOTION for Hearing & #33 MOTION to Dismiss Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates; atty failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to DE #30 & #33 ; atty shall prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a cert of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed orders & create a link to the related docket entries within 3 days. cc: COR (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION to Sever - MOTION to Remand & MOTION for Order to Transfer by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates (filed pursuant to QC re: DE #29 ) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dwayne Schiellack)(Dunaj, Sherryll) Modified by adding "Amended Complaint" to text on 1/14/2008 (KJR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2008: #2 Proposed Order) (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 32 CROSSCLAIM against ClassicStar, LLC, Geostar Corp., filed by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III.(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendants David Plummer and Spencer Plummer to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Defendants David Plummer and Spencer Plummer to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6))(Sim, J.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #29 MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates Motions referred to James B Todd. (Dunaj, Sherryll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2008: #1 Proposed Order) (JMW). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 29 INCORRECTLY FILED MOTION to Sever by Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) Modified on 1/14/2008 (KJR). (see DE #34 for correct filing) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 27 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint,,, Premiere Thoroughbred, et al. by Terry L. Green.(Irvin, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terry L. Green. (Irvin, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2008 Filing 25 FIRST ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint,,, by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co..(Green, Ronald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to clarify the scheduling order: that it intended to lift any stay on discovery in place upon entry of the scheduling order in this matter; to the extent that any party believes that they have need of relief from discovery, the party is free to seek such relief upon motion to the court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/4/08.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
January 2, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor re #21 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Page 3 of Exhibit 8 part 1 Security Agreement)(Clausen, Judy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 28, 2007 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Judy Clausen re #21 Amended Complaint; (1) page 3 of Exhibit 8-Part 1 is missing; atty shall prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach page 3 & create a link to the related docket entry atty has 3 days to cure the deficiency; (2) attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit 1" & "Exhibit 2"; clerk has renamed the attachments; it is necessary that all attachments are adequately described; (Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct)); no further action required re #2. cc: COR (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 27, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene by ClassicStar Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cross-Claims and Third-Party Complaint)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 27, 2007 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ClassicStar, LLC, National Equine Lending Co., Geostar Corp., Terry L. Green, Tony P. Ferguson, S. David Plummer, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., Does, filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Clausen, Judy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2008: #19 Page 3 to Exhibit 8 part 1 Security Agreement) (KJR). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (1) GRANTING #19 MOTION to Withdraw attys Bethany V. Crawley, Lindsey R. Trowell & Thomas C. Dearing as Attorney by ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson; (2) attys Bethany V. Crawley, Lindsey R. Trowell & Thomas C. Dearing are STRICKEN as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/27/07.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 21, 2007 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, Thomas E. Robinson to Remove Bethany V. Crawley, Lindsey R. Trowell and Thomas C. Dearing as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: (1) #17 MOTION to Remove Gregory B. Allen as Counsel of Record is GRANTED; (2) Gregory B. Allen is STRICKEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD for Dfts Terry L. Green, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/20/2007.(STB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 20, 2007 Attorney Update. Attorney Gregory B. Allen terminated. (STB) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 13, 2007 Filing 17 MOTION to Remove atty Gregory B. Allen as counsel of record by Terry L. Green, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. (filed in individual case & REFILED herein for case management purposes). (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (1) clerk file a copy of the Motion of pla Greg & Stephanie Minor & Premiere Thoroghbreds to remove Bradley Blair as counsel in Lexington Case No. 07-348; (2) GRANTING the #15 Motion to remove Bradley Blair as counsel of record in case 07-cv-353; (3) Bradley Blair is STRICKEN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/7/07. (KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 7, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Order to remove Bradley Blair as counsel of record by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor; (filed per court's 29 order in 07-353) (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 6, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO BETHANY V. CRAWLEY, THOMAS C. DEARING, LINDSEY R. TROWELL, non-registered attys re #13 Order, had to be MAILED TO non-registered attys, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that paragraph 4 of the court's #12 Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: That the parties shall have 30 days to respond to any motion filed as outlined in para 3 & that movants shall thereafter have 15 days to make their reply or replies. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/6/07.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) REFERRED to Mag Judge Todd for discovery disputes; (2) Amended Pleadings & Motions to Join Additional Parties due by 12/27/2007; (3) responses to complaints and/or motions to sever or transfer are due by 1/11/08; (4) parties have 30 days to respond to any motion filed as outlined in para 4 & movants shall have 15 days thereafter to reply; (5) Discovery due by 7/31/2008; (6) expert reports on issues where a party bears the burden of proof shall be filed by 8/14/08; rebuttal by 9/10/08; (7) expert discovery shall be completed by 9/30/08; (8) Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2008; (9) REFERRED to Mag Judge Todd for expedited settlement process; (10) parties shall coordinate written disc & submit between themselves; (11) depos shall be coordinated by all counsel w/parties having a mutual interest in the depo to coordinate questioning & declare prior to the depo an estimated amt of time; (12) clerk shall file a copy of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report (07-353) in the following cases: 6-243, 7-281, 7-347, 7-348, 7-349, 7-350, 7-351 & 7-352.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 27, 2007 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT (ordered filed per DE #25 in case 07-353)(KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 20, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Amanda Brockmann by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co..(Brockmann, Amanda) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 20, 2007 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Ronald Green re #9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ; Error: Pursuant to the #6 First Amended Practice & Procedure Order, atty should have filed this document in the individual case & the Master File; Entry by atty; Correction: clerk has refiled the document in the Master File as DE #19 ; counsel is advised to contact the ECF help desk if assistance is needed in filing this case & related cases; no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 19, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Ronald Green by Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co..(Green, Ronald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER clarifying its Practice & Procedure Order so that errors will not be repeated in the future; & DENYING Gastar's #16 Motion to Expedite Review (filed in the Master File 07-cv-353) re its motion to dismiss re (Plummer v. GeoStar Corp, Lex 07-cv-352). . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 9, 2007 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Memo in Opposition Schiellack Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (located in DE #1 transfer order re DE #31 Motion to Dismiss) filed by Stephanie Minor, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephanie Minor)(Murphy, Niels) Modified by adding a link on 11/13/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen). [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
November 5, 2007 Conflict Check run. (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER; case management procedures as noted in order . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A#2 Schedule B)(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 23, 2007 Filing 5 Letter from the court to MDL counsel (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form) (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER - (1) para 14 of the 2 Interim Practice & Procedure Order is AMENDED to reflect that the court will be guided by the Manual for Complex Litigation, Fourth approved by the Judicial Conf of US & that counsel are directed to familiarize themselves w/that publication; (2) clerk is directed to serve this order to COR & counsel in any addt'l cases transferred hereto. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (1) actions shall be STAYED only with regard to ClassicStar, LLC; (2) parties to file status report no later than 10 days after termination of stay; (3) Clerk directed to serve Order to counsel of record & counsel in any add'l case filed, removed or transferred hereto relating to the ClassicStar mare lease litigation. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER; case management procedures as noted in order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A#2 Schedule B)(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from District of USDC Middle District of Florida; Case Number 6:07-cv-976-JA. . Signed by Judge John G. Hyeburn, II. (Attachments: #1 Case Assignment #2 FL Docket Sheet#3 DE - 1 - Complaint#4 DE - 2 - Related Case Order#5 DE - 3 - Order#6 DE - 4 - Notice#7 DE - 5 - Certificate#8 DE - 6 - Not of Appearance#9 DE - 7 - Ntc of App#10 DE - 8 - Motion to extend time#11 DE - 9 - Cert#12 DE - 11 - Ntc Special App#13 DE - 12 - Notice of Filing#14 DE - 13 - Motion to Stay#15 DE - 14 - Memo#16 14 -1 - Order from Judge Hood#17 14-2 - Order#18 14-3 - ord#19 DE - Motion for Ext of Time#20 15-1 - Schedule#21 15-2 - Order#22 DE - 16 - Notice of Filing#23 16-1 - MDL Ntc#24 DE - 17 - Motion for Ext of Time#25 17-1 - Schedule#26 17-2 - Order#27 DE - 18 - Response#28 DE - 19 - Ntc of Pending Related Cases#29 DE - 20 - Certificate#30 DE - 21 - Amended Cert#31 DE - 22 - Motion to Dismiss#32 22-1 - Notice#33 22-2 - Afdt#34 DE - 23 - Mot for Ext of Time#35 DE - 24 - Mot#36 24-1 - Mtn#37 24-2 - Mot#38 DE - 25 - Order#39 DE - 26 - Transfer Ord)(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC et al v. ClassicStar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony P. Ferguson
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Julie Cave
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Robinson
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Julie Cave
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Julie Cave
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar 2004, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classicstar Farms, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Equine Lending Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC
Represented By: T. Scott White
Represented By: Jason W. Crowell
Represented By: Gloria S. Hong
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Represented By: Emily H. Cowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III
Represented By: T. Scott White
Represented By: Jason W. Crowell
Represented By: Gloria S. Hong
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Represented By: Emily H. Cowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. David Plummer
Represented By: T. Scott White
Represented By: Jason W. Crowell
Represented By: Gloria S. Hong
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Represented By: Emily H. Cowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New NEL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Green
Represented By: Gregory B. Allen
Represented By: David W. Henry
Represented By: John G. Irvin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geostar Financial Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Equine Energy Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co.
Represented By: Gregory B. Allen
Represented By: David W. Henry
Represented By: Ronald L. Green
Represented By: Amanda Lee Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiellack & Associates
Represented By: Sherryll Martens Dunaj
Represented By: Robert Michael Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geostar Equine Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Julie Cave
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gastar Exploration, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Handler, J.D. P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Parrott
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Matthew R. Lindblom
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Julie Cave
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Represented By: Lea Pauley Goff
Represented By: Jason Trent Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Schiellack
Represented By: Sherryll Martens Dunaj
Represented By: Robert Michael Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Geostar Corp.
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Owen
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: James D. Lyon
Represented By: John O'Neill Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Classicstar, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Dearing
Represented By: Kara Read Marino
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: George Edward Henry, II
Represented By: Bethany V. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Zeus Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jason W. Crowell
Represented By: Gloria S. Hong
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: S. David Plummer, II
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: National Equine Lending Company, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Minor
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Represented By: Jayson E. Blake
Represented By: Judy A. Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Minor
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Represented By: Jayson E. Blake
Represented By: Judy A. Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Represented By: Jayson E. Blake
Represented By: Judy A. Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Dennis M. Dolan
Represented By: C. Edward Craft
Represented By: John R. Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?