Magid v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Adam R Magid
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00271
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Adam R Magid to US Attorney General, Washington, D.C. on 2/28/19. (RMF)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Adam R Magid to SSA, Atlanta, GA on 2/26/19. (RMF).
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Adam R Magid. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (RMF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RMF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Adam R Magid. (Boyd, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Adam R Magid. Related case(s): No (Boyd, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 form for summons and complaint. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Office of General Council, #2 Appendix Attorney General)(Boyd, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Adam R Magid. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Office of General Council, #2 Proposed Summons Attorney General)(Boyd, Bradley)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/27/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/27/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/13/2019. (RMF)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (RMF)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/11/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-271-Orl-22TBS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (SJB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Adam R Magid. (Boyd, Bradley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Adam R Magid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magid v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam R Magid
Represented By: Bradley K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?