Haviland v. Poinciana Medical Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nathan Haviland, Keith Oleary and Timothy Shaw
Defendant: Poinciana Medical Center, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc., HCA Healthcare, Inc., Does 1 through 25, Fort Walton Beach Medical Center, Inc., Palms West Hospital LP and East Florida Division, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00293
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion to Dismiss Action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/11/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Action by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Emmanuel, John)
March 28, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Second Amended Complaint due by 4/3/2019 (LMM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion Requesting Judicial Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ; denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss Class Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; denying as moot #13 Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. #28 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/27/2019. (ctp) (JLC) (JLC).
March 25, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc., Poinciana Medical Center, Inc., Fort Walton Beach Medical Center, Inc., Palms West Hospital LP, East Florida Division, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Nathan Haviland, Timothy Shaw, Keith Oleary.(Lee, Jared) Modified on 3/26/2019 (LMM).
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Trehan, Ashley)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/15/2019. (EC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically by HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc. (Trehan, Ashley) Modified on 3/14/2019 (MAA).
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 Remark: Doc. #21 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/12/19. (MT)
March 12, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and incorporated memorandum of law, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Class Complaint Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Incorporated Memoraumd of Law. Responses due by 3/25/2019 (LMM)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/12/2019. (EC)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Class Complaint Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Incorporated Memoraumd of Law, #12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and incorporated memorandum of law by Nathan Haviland. (Lee, Jared) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by Nathan Haviland. (Lee, Jared) Modified on 3/12/2019 (LMM).
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nathan Haviland. Related case(s): no (Lee, Jared)
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 Remark: Docs. #15 , #16 , and #18 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/4/19. (PKK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Poinciana Medical Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Columbia Park Healthcare Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate HCA Inc., Other Affiliate Galen Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Healthtrust, Inc. - The Hospital Company, Other Affiliate HCA Healthcare, Inc., Other Affiliate Hospital Corp., LLC, Other Affiliate MediVision, Inc., Other Affiliate Medical Care America, LLC, Other Affiliate Surgico, LLC, Other Affiliate HCA Squared, LLC for Poinciana Medical Center, Inc. (Tache, Walter) Modified on 3/1/2019 (LMM).
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Poinciana Medical Center, Inc. Related case(s): No (Tache, Walter) Modified on 3/1/2019 (LMM).
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by HCA Healthcare, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate HCA Inc., Other Affiliate Healthtrust, Inc. - The Hospital Company, Other Affiliate HTI Hospital Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate North Florida Division I, Inc., Other Affiliate Columbia Florida Group, Inc., Other Affiliate HCA Eastern Group, Inc. for HCA Healthcare, Inc... (Emmanuel, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by North Florida Division I, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Columbia Florida Group, Inc., Other Affiliate HCA Inc., Other Affiliate Healthtrust, Inc. - The Hospital Company, Other Affiliate HTI Hospital Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate HCA Healthcare, Inc., Other Affiliate HCA Eastern Group, Inc. for North Florida Division I, Inc... (Emmanuel, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Emmanuel, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Class Complaint Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Incorporated Memoraumd of Law by Poinciana Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tache, Walter) Modified on 2/26/2019 (LMM).
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and incorporated memorandum of law by HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc.. (Emmanuel, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Requesting the Court to Take Judicial Notice of Certain Documents by HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HCA Healthcare (HCA Holdings) Amendment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Poinciana Articles of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from HCA Healthcare's 2017 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit 4 - Poinciana AHCA License, #5 Exhibit 5 - Poinciana Fictitious Name Registration)(Emmanuel, John)
February 19, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 2/25/2019. (LMM)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses from Defendants Poinciana Medical Center, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc., and HCA Healthcare, Inc. due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/15/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc. (Trehan, Ashley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 2/15/2019 (LMM).
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Emmanuel on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc. (Emmanuel, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/14/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/14/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Bruce Trehan on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc., North Florida Division I, Inc. (Trehan, Ashley)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-293-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Greg Warren re #1 Notice of Removal by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Emmanuel, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael Bray re #1 Notice of Removal by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Emmanuel, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-000102-OC filed in State Court on 1/10/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15127430 filed by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B - Returns of Service, #3 State Court Other Documents Composite Exhibit C - State Court Filings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emmanuel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haviland v. Poinciana Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinciana Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Walter J. Tache
Represented By: Magda Christina Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Florida Division I, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Bruce Trehan
Represented By: John David Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: John David Emmanuel
Represented By: Ashley Bruce Trehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Walton Beach Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palms West Hospital LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Florida Division, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Haviland
Represented By: Jared Michael Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Oleary
Represented By: Jared Michael Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Shaw
Represented By: Jared Michael Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?