Olaogun v. Bank Of America, NA
Plaintiff: Isaac Olaogun
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00339
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Linda Broocks terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/4/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Linda Broocks to withdraw as attorney by Bank of America N.A.. (Parrino, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER for Linda Brooks and Ghazal Vahora to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/20/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (GNB).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cameron J. Asby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/19/2019. (EC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of compliance re #45 Compliance notice, #44 MOTION for Cameron J. Asby to withdraw as attorney of record by TD Bank, N.A. (Stern, Justin) Modified on 3/18/2019 (DMA).
March 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of compliance re #44 MOTION for Cameron J. Asby to withdraw as attorney of record by TD Bank, N.A. (Stern, Justin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Cameron J. Asby to withdraw as attorney of record by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stern, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
March 11, 2019 Filing 43 CASE REFERRED to Mediation (Mediator: Mickey Mills). (DMA)
March 11, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 4/5/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/17/2019, Discovery due by 7/11/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2019, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/15/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Pretrial statement due by 11/19/2019, All other motions due by 11/26/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Bench Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (DMA)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/11/2019. (MMW)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #30 Third Party Complaint by TD Bank, N.A..(Stern, Justin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE to counsel Marrick Armstrong, Esq. of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
March 7, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Parrino, Marc) Modified on 3/8/2019 (DMA).
March 7, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #33 Interested persons order by Bank of America N.A.. (Parrino, Marc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #32 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America N.A.. Related case(s): no (Parrino, Marc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Parrino, Marc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #33 Interested persons order by TD Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Toronto-Dominion Bank, The for TD Bank, N.A... (Stern, Justin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #32 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TD Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): No. (Stern, Justin) Modified on 3/7/2019 (DMA).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/5/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/5/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed Modified on 3/5/2019 (GNB).
March 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance (Lead Counsel) Appearance by Marc Thomas Parrino on behalf of Bank of America N.A. (Parrino, Marc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 30 Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TD Bank, N.A. filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Serradet, Sahily)
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M.L. Stern on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Stern, Justin)
February 21, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/28/2019 (DMA)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Third-Party Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. Bank of America, N.A.'s Third-Party Complaint (Doc. #15 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Thursday, February 28, 2019, Bank of America, N.A., may file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file will result in dismissal of Bank of America, N.A.'s action against TD Bank, N.A. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/21/2019. (JRJ)
February 21, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Case management report due by 3/7/2019 (DMA)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #22 Defendant, Bank of America, N.A.'s, Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadlines for Completion of Discovery and Dispositive Motions. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer telephonically for the purpose of establishing new deadlines and preparing a case management report. A form may be found on the Court's web page [https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judicalInfo/Orlando/JgByron.htm]. The parties are advised that this matter will not be set any later than on the January 2020 trial term. The case management report is due on or before March 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/21/2019. (MMW)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to counsel (Ghazal Asrar Vahora, Linda Broocks, and Cameron J. Asby) of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01627. File received electronically
February 20, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Middle District of Floriday, Orlando Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 2/20/19, filed. (rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division; granting #23 motion to transfer venue.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Bank Of America, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Abate, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extend the Deadlines for Completion of Discovery and Dispositive Motions( Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019.) by Bank Of America, NA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Discovery Motion Deadlines)(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by TD Bank, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Asby, Cameron) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TD Bank, NA identifying TD Bank US Holding Company, TD Group US Holdings LLC, The Toronto-Dominion Bank as Corporate Parent, filed.(Asby, Cameron) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time; terminating #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for TD Bank, N.A. to file its answer or response to Third-Party Plaintiff's Third-Party Complaint is January 11, 2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File its Answer or Otherwise Respond to Third-Party Plaintiff's Third-Party Complaint by TD Bank, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asby, Cameron) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File its Answer or Otherwise Respond to Third-Party Plaintiff's Third-Party Complaint by TD Bank, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asby, Cameron) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to TD Bank, NA served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018, filed.(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to TD Bank, NA. Issued summons forwarded to Intake for pick up, per request, filed.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TD Bank, NA filed by Bank Of America, NA.(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bank Of America, NA, filed.(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Leave to File third party complaint.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Bank Of America, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Linda Broocks in place of Garett Willig, Attorney Linda Broocks for Bank Of America, NA added Attorney Garett A Willig terminated(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Linda Broocks in place of Garett Willig by Bank Of America, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broocks, Linda) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2-4 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2018 Pltf Expert Report due by 11/9/2018. Deft Expert Report due by 12/7/2018. Discovery due by 1/22/2019. Mediation due by 6/4/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/25/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/25/2019. Objections due by 6/21/2019 Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2019. Docket Call set for 6/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H Miller(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Isaac Olaogun, filed.(Vahora, Ghazal) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bank Of America, NA, filed.(Willig, Garett) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Bank Of America, NA 8/6/2018.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File its Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank Of America, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Willig, Garett) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America, NA. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bank Of America, NA, filed.(Vahora, Ghazal) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Summons Not Issued as to C.T. Corporation System due to these deficiencies: Party named on summons is not a named defendant on the case. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(hler, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 8/22/2018 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bank Of America, NA, filed.(Vahora, Ghazal) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, NA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20096745) filed by Isaac Olaogun.(Vahora, Ghazal) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olaogun v. Bank Of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Olaogun
Represented By: Ghazal Asrar Vahora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Garett Anton Willig
Represented By: Linda Broocks
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Represented By: Sahily Serradet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Cameron J. Asby
Represented By: Justin M.L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?