Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. v. Protech Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc and Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.
Defendant: Protech Products, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00405
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Protech Products, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Davis, Timothy)
April 12, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/19/2019 (DMA)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 motion to amend/correct. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separate document on or before April 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/12/2019. (MKH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint with Exhibits A-D, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on 03/11/2019 by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. as to Protech Products, Inc.. (McDonough, James)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to strike #19 Amended Complaint filed by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/8/2019. (DJD)
April 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Travis E. Lynch, appearing on behalf of Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL081616.) Related document: #18 MOTION for Travis E. Lynch to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
April 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James F. McDonough, III, appearing on behalf of Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL081616.) Related document: #17 MOTION for James F. McDonough, III to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/29/2019. (MKH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 **STRICKEN PER #21 ORDER** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Protech Products, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8464475, #2 Exhibit B - ProTech Online Flashing, #3 Exhibit C - PipeBoot Express Flashing, #4 Exhibit D - Photos)(Davis, Timothy) Modified on 4/8/2019 (DMA).
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Travis E. Lynch to appear pro hac vice by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Frijouf, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for James F. McDonough, III to appear pro hac vice by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Frijouf, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Frijouf on behalf of Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc (Frijouf, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Davis, Timothy) Modified on 3/25/2019 (JET).
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Davis, Timothy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Protech Products, Inc.. (Rapacke, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant by 4/2/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/19/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Rapacke on behalf of Protech Products, Inc. (Rapacke, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/8/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/22/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 3/8/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Amended to include court seal, Clerk information, and date.) (JET)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Patent Report (previously filed as "Notice" at entry #3) sent to Alexandria, VA. (JET)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel (James F. McDonough III and Travis Lynch) of Local Rule 2.02(signed by deputy clerk). (AC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Protech Products, Inc.. (AC)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-405-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc of Proposed Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark (Davis, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Davis, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Protech Products, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15189327) filed by Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Summons)(Davis, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc. v. Protech Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protech Products, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Rapacke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc
Represented By: Timothy C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Fasteners, Inc.
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III.
Represented By: Timothy C. Davis
Represented By: Travis E. Lynch
Represented By: Daniel Robert Frijouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?