Sidewalk Chef, LLC v. Galen's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sidewalk Chef, LLC
Defendant: Galen's Inc. and Greg Leintz
Case Number: 6:2019cv00408
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sidewalk Chef, LLC. Related case(s): y (Tadros, Jacqueline)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order, #1 Complaint by Sidewalk Chef, LLC. (Tadros, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/8/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/22/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 3/8/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Galen's Inc., Greg Leintz. (AC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-408-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Galen's Inc., Greg Leintz with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15193440) filed by Sidewalk Chef, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reg. No. 4,707,147, #2 Exhibit WHO IS Report, #3 Exhibit TM Ser. No. 87/650,745, #4 Exhibit TM Ser. No. 87/650,737, #5 Exhibit Jan. 31, 2018 Office Action, #6 Exhibit Jan. 31, 2018 Office Action, #7 Exhibit TTAB-Pet. to Cancel, #8Composite Exh. H - Part 1, #9Composite Exh. H - Part 2, #10Composite Exh. H - Part 3, #11Composite Exhibit -TTAB, #12 Exhibit WHO IS Report, #13 Exhibit Daytona Bike Week, #14 Exhibit Specimen Ser. No. 87/650,737, #15 Exhibit Specimen Ser. No. 87/650,745, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons Galen's Inc., #18 Proposed Summons Greg Leintz)(Tadros, Jacqueline) Modified on 3/5/2019 (AC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidewalk Chef, LLC v. Galen's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidewalk Chef, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Tadros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Leintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?