Beck v. Bluegreen Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Beck
Defendant: Bluegreen Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacation Club, Inc., Vacation Trust Inc,, Lenka Escobar and Vacation Trust, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00415
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to show cause filed by Nancy Beck. (Hackett, Donald)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Nancy Beck. (Hackett, Donald)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nancy Beck. Related case(s): no (Hackett, Donald) Modified on 4/15/2019 (LMM).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/29/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bluegreen Corporation, Bluegreen Vacation Club, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Vacation Trust, Inc. (No summons provided for defendant Lenka Escobar). (AC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-415-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Bluegreen Corporation, Bluegreen Vacation Club, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Lenka Escobar, Vacation Trust Inc, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15197368) filed by Nancy Beck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Vacation Trust Summons, #3 Proposed Summons BG Corp SUmmons, #4 Proposed Summons BVC Summons, #5 Proposed Summons BVU Summons)(Hackett, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Bluegreen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Beck
Represented By: Donald Sheridan Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegreen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacation Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacation Trust Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenka Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacation Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?