Spinners Performing Arts, LLC et al v. Charles Ross, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough, Spinners Performing Arts, LLC and Henry L. Fambrough
Defendant: Charles Ross, Jr. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 6:2019cv00527
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 29 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Order) (MAA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A STIPULATED ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting #26 Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Order of Permanent Injunction and Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/22/2019. (MMW) Modified on 5/23/2019 (MAA).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Joint MOTION for permanent injunction By Stipulation and For Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Henry L. Fambrough, Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to submit their proposed Order Granting the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order of Permanent Injunction and Dismissal without Prejudice in Microsoft Word format to the Court's email [chambers_flmd_Byron@flmd.uscourts.gov] on or before May 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/20/2019. (MMW)
May 17, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order of Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathis, Paul) Modified on 5/20/2019 (AC).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/29/2019. (HMK)
April 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to 5/16/19 to File Responsive Pleadings by All Defendants. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 4/29/2019 (AC).(MAA).
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on April 06, 2019 by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC as to Charles Ross, Jr. (Mathis, Paul)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER denying #21 Motion to Appoint Process Server for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a). The Motion contains no memorandum of law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/3/2019. (HMK)
April 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Paul Mathis, appearing on behalf of Henry L. Fambrough, Spinners Performing Arts, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL081767.) Related document: #19 Second MOTION for Paul Mathis to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Appoint Expert Appoint Process Server by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. (Hicks, Reginald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/29/2019. (HMK)
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Paul Mathis to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hicks, Reginald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Henry L. Fambrough re: #14 Amended Complaint by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. (Hicks, Reginald)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Charles Ross, Jr. (DMA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. (Hicks, Reginald)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested Persons order by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Henry L. Fambrough for Spinners Performing Arts, LLC.. (Hicks, Reginald) Modified on 3/27/2019 (DMA).
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Hicks, Reginald)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 **Duplicate. Re-filed by counsel at doc. #14** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hicks, Reginald) Modified on 3/27/2019 (DMA).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #5 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/25/2019. (HMK)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/22/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/22/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 21, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/1/2019 (DMA)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER amending: 4 ENDORSED ORDER striking #1 Verified Complaint for non-compliance with Middle District of Florida Local Rule 1.05(a). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint on or before April 1, 2019. Further, the summons at #7 is stricken as incomplete. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/21/2019. (MMW)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 **STRICKEN AS INCOMPLETE PER 9 ORDER** SUMMONS issued as to Charles Ross, Jr. (AC) Modified on 3/21/2019 (DMA).
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #5 First MOTION for Paul Mathis to appear pro hac vice by Reginald D. Hicks on behalf of Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough (Hicks, Reginald)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Paul Mathis to appear pro hac vice by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough. (Hicks, Reginald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER striking #1 Verified Complaint for non-compliance with Middle District of Florida Local Rule 1.05(a). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/20/2019. (JRJ)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough. (Hicks, Reginald)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-527-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 **STRICKEN PER 9 ORDER** COMPLAINT against Charles Ross, Jr with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15252137) filed by Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Verification)(Hicks, Reginald) Modified on 3/21/2019 (DMA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spinners Performing Arts, LLC et al v. Charles Ross, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spinners Performing Arts, LLC; Henry L. Fambrough
Represented By: Reginald D. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spinners Performing Arts, LLC
Represented By: Paul Mathis, Jr.
Represented By: Reginald D. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Fambrough
Represented By: Paul Mathis, Jr.
Represented By: Reginald D. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ross, Jr.
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?