Greater Orlando Aviation Authority v. Melbourne Airport Authority
Plaintiff: Greater Orlando Aviation Authority
Defendant: Melbourne Airport Authority
Case Number: 6:2019cv00540
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Harry Schafer appointed as Mediator. (SPM)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2019, Discovery due by 8/3/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2020, Pretrial statement due by 1/8/2021, All other motions due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/10/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/10/2020, Trial Status Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing 2/1/2021 in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/1/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/1/2019. (DJD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 17(b) filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Luther, Stephen)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 13) #13. The response is due by 5/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/22/2019. (MB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 29, 2019, to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 17(b) by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Luther, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/22/2019 (SPM).
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Luther, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 17(b) by Melbourne Airport Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lott, Leslie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. Related case(s): No (Luther, Stephen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Luther, Stephen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service on Defendant by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice, #7 Interested persons order (Luther, Stephen) Modified on 4/9/2019 (SPM).
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel, Giulia C. Farrior, of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (copy mailed) (SPM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Melbourne Airport Authority. (Lott, Leslie)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/10/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 3/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/27/2019 by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority as to Melbourne Airport Authority. (Luther, Stephen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Melbourne Airport Authority. (MAA)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits, Part 1, #2 Complaint & Exhibits, Part 2) (MAA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-540-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melbourne Airport Authority with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15257102) filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit B - MLBAir website, #3 Exhibit C - TheOrlandoAirport website, #4 Exhibit D - Theotherorlandoairport website, #5 Exhibit E - Social Media websites, #6 Exhibit F - Delta Skyline Ad, #7 Exhibit G - Ticket Seller websites, #8 Exhibit H - 11-2-2015 Board Minutes, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons to Melbourne Airport Authority)(Luther, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater Orlando Aviation Authority v. Melbourne Airport Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Orlando Aviation Authority
Represented By: Stephen H. Luther
Represented By: Keith A. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melbourne Airport Authority
Represented By: Giulia Christine Farrior
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: Leslie J. Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?