Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 72.189.105.165 and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv00629
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #11 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/1/2019. (TKW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice of John Doe by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel) Modified on 7/1/2019 (LMM).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/6/2019. (RN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned pursuant to standing order in case 8:19-mc-41-T-23 to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-629-Orl-31DCI. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (Standing order attached for reference). (ALL)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/3/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/3/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LMM)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-629-Orl-31TBS. (SJB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Property Rights Infringement- Injunctive Relief Sought against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15303820) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel) Modified on 4/2/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 72.189.105.165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?