Seymore v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Phillip M. Seymore
Defendant: Michael Sullivan, Stasia Warren, Florida Department of Revenue Title IV-D, Neal Coffin, Charles Ruppel and Karen Foxman
Case Number: 6:2019cv00650
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting #10 Report and Recommendations; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2019. (SCM)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations by Phillip M. Seymore. (RDO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DENY the Motion (Doc. No. 2); 2. DISMISS the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 9) with prejudice; and 3. Direct the Clerk to CLOSE the case. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/16/2019. (MB)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Neal Coffin, Florida Department of Revenue Title IV-D, Charles Ruppel, Michael Sullivan with Jury Demand. Terminating Karen Foxman (Judge, official capacity) and Stasia Warren (Judge, official capacity) filed by Phillip M. Seymore. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Phillip M. Seymore.(RDO)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Phillip M. Seymore. Related case(s): yes (RDO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Phillip M. Seymore. (RDO)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/16/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/16/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Phillip M. Seymore. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Phillip M. Seymore.(RDO)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to strike re: #1 Complaint filed by Phillip M. Seymore. On or before April 29, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a); and failure to file the amended complaint may result in the case being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/9/2019. (MB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip M. Seymore. (AC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 (STRICKEN BY #3 ORDER) COMPLAINT against Neal Coffin, Florida Department of Revenue Title IV-D, Karen Foxman, Charles Ruppel, Michael Sullivan, Stasia Warren filed by Phillip M. Seymore.(AC) Modified on 4/10/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymore v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stasia Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Revenue Title IV-D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ruppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Foxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip M. Seymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?