Roor International BV et al v. King James Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Jack A Barnes, King James Enterprises, Inc. and Jack A. Barnes
Case Number: 6:2019cv00659
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 7/12/2019 (LMM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #5. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/20/19. (ESG)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to King James Enterprises, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Jack A. Barnes. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LMM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jack A. Barnes, King James Enterprises, Inc.(LMM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-659-ORL-37TBS. (SJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15329290) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. King James Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King James Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?