Roor International BV et al v. Kronic Underground, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Kronic Underground, LLC and Brian K Woodring
Case Number: 6:2019cv00661
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit as to Damages, #3 Affidavit as to Value of Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Kronic Underground, LLC, and Brian K Woodring by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 4/17/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Brian K Woodring. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Kronic Underground, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER re #11 Notice of Striking Docket Entry 10. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove 10 from the docket. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/2/2019. (MMW)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entry 10 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc., re 10 Notice of pendency of related cases (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 5/2/2019 (AC).
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 (STRICKEN AND REMOVED per 12)-NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 5/2/2019 (AC).
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc., identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc.; Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Kronic Underground, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 4/17/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Brian K Woodring. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/11/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/11/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Kronic Underground, LLC, Brian K Woodring. (AC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-661-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15329512) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Kronic Underground, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kronic Underground, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K Woodring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?