Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: James R Knapton and Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00701
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiffs' counsel shall pay sanctions in the amount of $5,060.50 to Defense counsel Minerley Fein, PA. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/10/2019. (DJD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for default judgment against Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit as to Damages, #3 Affidavit as to Value of Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasson, Jamie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. (DMA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 6/25/2019. Court reads timeline of non-compliance for each case into the record. Plaintiffs respond and explain non-compliance. Court takes matter under advisement. Counsel for Pltfs: Chezare Palacios and Jamie Alan Sasson. Start time: 2:00 p.m; End time: 2:35 p.m. Total time: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (DJD)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (DMA)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to show cause specifically Attorneys Jamie Alan Sasson and Chezare Palacios as to why sanctions should not be imposed as to Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/28/2019. (DJD)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 7), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 6). Responses due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/14/2019. (DJD)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (DMA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to James R Knapton, Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.. (DMA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-701-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15350707) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Dreams USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Knapton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipe Dreams USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?