Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Planet, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Achraf Alami and Pipe Planet, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00702
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
3 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 6/25/2019. Court reads timeline of non-compliance for each case into the record. Plaintiffs respond and explain non-compliance. Defendant provides billing records to the Court for each case. Court takes matter under advisement. Counsel for Pltfs: Chezare Palacios and Jamie Alan Sasson. Counsel for Deft: Kenneth L. Minerley; Start time: 2:00 p.m; End time: 2:35 p.m. Total time: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (DJD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to show cause specifically Attorneys Jamie Alan Sasson and Chezare Palacios as to why sanctions should not be imposed as to Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/28/2019. (DJD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC.(Minerley, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #18 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/17/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-702-Orl-31TBS. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER transferring case to United States Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/13/2019. (MDH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:19-cv-702-Orl-41LRH. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this case be transferred to the Honorable Carlos E. Mendoza, with his permission, for consideration with 6:19-cv-697. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/13/2019. (TKW)
May 13, 2019 Set/reset deadlines for Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC. Answer due by 5/24/2019. (BIA)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/13/2019. (MDH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC. (Minerley, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC. Related case(s): Y (Minerley, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC. (Minerley, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc.; Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV.. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/19/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Pipe Planet, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/17/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Achraf Alami, Pipe Planet, LLC. (BIA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-702-Orl-31LRH. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15350812) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Pipe Planet, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achraf Alami
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipe Planet, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?