Roor International BV et al v. Puff Smoke Shop, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Puff Smoke Shop, LLC and Sunette Elkhaldi
Case Number: 6:2019cv00704
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for default judgment against Puff Smoke Shop, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit as to Damages, #3 Affidavit as to Value of Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Puff Smoke Shop, LLC (RDO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Puff Smoke Shop, LLC by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Palacios, Chezare) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #17 Order to show cause filed by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Palacios, Chezare)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to show cause as to Defendant Sunette Elkhaldi. On or before July 12, 2019, Ms. Elkhaldi shall show cause in writing why her answer should not be stricken, and default entered against her for failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/25/2019. (MDH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to show cause as to the Plaintiffs. On or before July 5, 2019, the Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal of the claims against Puff Smoke Shop, should not be imposed for failure to promptly move for clerk's default against Puff Smoke Shop. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/24/2019. (MDH)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing compliance as to Sunette Elkhadi. Defendant has failed to comply with the Court's Order #14. Sunette Elkhadi shall file her response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Sunette Elkhaldi shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sunette Elkhaldi.(RDO)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER re: #11 Notice of Striking Docket Entry 10. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement 10. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/30/2019. (MMW)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. re 10 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement of Striking DE 10 (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 (REMOVED PER #12 ENDORSED ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 4/30/2019 (RDO).
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/17/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Puff Smoke Shop, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RDO)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (RDO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-704-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15350911) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Puff Smoke Shop, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puff Smoke Shop, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunette Elkhaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?