Roor International BV et al v. Quick Chek Foodstore, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Amisha Patel and Quick Chek Foodstore, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00706
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Order directing compliance, #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 7), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 6). Responses due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/14/2019. (DJD)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Amisha Patel. (SPM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Quick Chek Foodstore, Inc. (SPM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (SPM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-706-Orl-41TBS. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15351081) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Quick Chek Foodstore, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amisha Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Chek Foodstore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?