Jackson et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Linda Jackson and Henry W. Jackson
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00761
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER striking #9 Objection to the Magistrate Report and Recommendation and Order. This case is closed (see Doc. #8) and the Court does not accept objections to Orders closing a case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2019. (JRJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 (STRICKEN PER 10)-OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations and #8 ORDER by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. (AC) Modified on 6/25/2019 (AC).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting and confirming #6 Report and Recommendations; overruling #7 Plaintiffs' Objection; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The #5 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/4/2019. (JRJ)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. (AC)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating Report and Recommendation #4 and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Henry W. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/29/2019. (EC)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson.(AC)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 (Vacated per #6)- REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/22/2019. (Smith, Thomas) Modified on 5/30/2019 (AC).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER carrying IFP motion and giving Plaintiff leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/29/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. (AC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (AC).
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Henry W. Jackson, Linda Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(AC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #3 Exhibit-Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (AC). Modified on 4/26/2019 (AC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?