Zalloum v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Interested Party: United States Trustee, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Trustee, River Oaks Community Services, Locke Lord LLP and River Oaks III HOA
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum
Trustee: Trustee Laurie K Weatherford
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 6:2019cv00797
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Set deadline: Appellant Brief due by 7/15/2019. (AC)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing compliance as to Appellee The Bank of New York Mellon. Appellee has failed to comply with the Court's Orders #7 and #8. Appellee shall file a response to said Orders within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant's new deadline to file initial brief is Monday, July 15, 2019. Further extensions of time will NOT BE GRANTED absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2019. (JRJ)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Julie Baker Zalloum. (LMM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julie Baker Zalloum. Related case(s): yes. (LMM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Julie Baker Zalloum. (LMM) Modified on 6/28/2019 (LMM).
June 10, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 6. Mail resent to an alternate forwarding address for Locke Lord LLP that was on the envelope. That address is 777 S. Flagler Drive, Ste. 215, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (AC)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-797-Orl-40. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Judge Paul G. Byron, with his consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:18-cv-341-Orl-40. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (JLC)
June 3, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Appellant Brief due by 6/28/2019 (LMM)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief to June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for 30 day Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Julie Baker Zalloum. (LMM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: filed by Julie Baker Zalloum. (Attachments: #1 2 6-17-bk-02329 Docket Sheet, #2 3 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000159_Memorandum_Opinion_Overruling_Debtors_Objection_to_BONYs_Claim_5_and_Granting_Stay_Relie, #3 4 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000160_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #4 5 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000161_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Continuing_Trial, #5 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000155_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_AUGUST_13_2018_on_IN_RE_JULIE_ZALLOUM_To_purchase_a_c, #6 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000156_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_JUNE_7_2018_on_IN_RE_JULIE_ZALLOUM_To_purchase_a_copy, #7 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000162_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay_by_Bank_of_New_York_Mellon_The_Automatic_Stay, #8 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000183_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Granting_Bank_of_New_York_Mellon_Stay_Re, #9 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000186_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie, #10 6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000187_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #11 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13_Filing_Fee_Paid_Schedules_and_Statements_Not_Filed, #12 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000002_Statement_of_Debtors_Social_Security_Numbers_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #13 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000003_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines_ser, #14 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000004_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_chapter_13_plan_summary_of_assets_schedules_A-J_declaration, #15 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000005_Third_Amended_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2016-3_Prescribing_Procedures_for_Chapter_13_Cases, #16 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Status_Conference__Hearing_scheduled_for_6202017_at_1100_AM_at_Orlando_FL_-, #17 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000007_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #18 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000008_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest, #19 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000009_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #20 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000010_Summary_of_Assets__Schedules_A_-_J_and_Summary_of_Assets_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Requ, #21 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000011_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zallou, #22 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000012_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #23 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000013_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Seth_J_Greenhill_on_behalf_of_Creditor_US_Bank_National_Asso, #24 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000014_Certificate_of_Mailing_of_Proof_of_Claim_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of_Cr, #25 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000015_Certificate_of_Mailing_of_Proof_of_Claim_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of_Cr, #26 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000016_Certificate_of_Credit_Counseling_Date_Course_was_Completed_5102017_Filed_by_Debtor_Ju, #27 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000017_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Seth_J_Greenhill_on_behalf_of_Creditor_US_Ban, #28 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000018_Response_to_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Chapter_13_Plan_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Bak, #29 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000020_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_Contains_negative_notice_for_debtors_failure_to_comply_with_11_U, #30 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000021_Notice_of_Requirement_to_File_a_Statement_of_Completion_of_Course_in_Personal_Financial_Ma, #31 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000022_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Julie_Zalloum_Dor_Laurie_Weatherfor, #32 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000023_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #33 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000024_Order_Granting_Ore_Tenus_Motion_to_Abate_Payments_Service_Instructions_Laurie_Weatherford, #34 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000025_Verified_Response_to_and_Objection_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_and_Request_for_Hea, #35 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000026_Withdrawal_of_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Comply_With_11_USC_ 1308_AND_52, #36 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000027_DOCUMENT_NOT_PROCESSED, #37 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000028_Motion_to_Extend_Time_of_Proof_of_Claim_Bar_Date_Filed_by_Douglas_Goldin_on_behalf_of_Cred, #38 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000029_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_US_Banks_Motion_to_Extend_Proof_o, #39 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000030_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #40 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000030_Part_2_Exhibit_1_-_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion, #41 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000031_Notice_Rescheduling_Status_Conference_and_Motion_by_US_Bank_to_Extend_Time_of_Proof_of_Cla, #42 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000032_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #43 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000033_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Debtor_has_21_days_to, #44 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000034_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_as_Additional_Counsel_Filed_by_Christopher_R_E, #45 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000035_Withdrawal_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Filed_by_Tru, #46 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000036_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Ana_Devilliers_Trustee_Atty_Chris_Ev, #47 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000038_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay, #48 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_AMENDED_TO_CORRECT_RULING_APPEARANCES_Ana_Dev, #49 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000040_Letter_Re_Filed_by_James_E_Olsen_providing_information_on_assets_not_listed_in_the_debto, #50 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000041_Certificate_of_Mailing_Re_DE38_Order_Granting_US_Banks_Motion_for_Relief_From_Stay_post, #51 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000042_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #52 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000043_Certificate_of_Mailing_Order_Granting_US_Bank_NAs_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #53 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000044_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay_Filed_by_Debtor_J, #54 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000045_Objection_to_Claim, #55 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000046_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim, #56 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000047_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #57 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_1_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Claim_No_2-1_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behal, #58 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_2_Exhibit, #59 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_3_Exhibit, #60 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_4_Exhibit, #61 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000049_Objection_to_Claim, #62 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000050_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim_no_4_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust_Matte, #63 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000051_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #64 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000052_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_6_Filed_by_US_Bank_Nationa_Association_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie, #65 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000053_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_by_Debtor_to_Proof_of_Claim_No_6_Filed_by_US_Bank, #66 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000054_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #67 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000055_DOCUMENT_NOT_PROCESSED, #68 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000056_Corrective_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_6_Filed_by_Douglas_Goldin_on, #69 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000057_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE, #70 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000058_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE_BANK_OF_N, #71 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000059_Response_to_Objection_to_Claim, #72 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_1_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_StatusValue_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust_Company__Total_S, #73 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #74 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #75 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000061_Objection_to_Claim, #76 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000062_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim, #77 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000063_Response_to_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_StatusValue_Claim_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust, #78 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000064_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #79 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000065_Joint_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_Filed_by_Austin_M_Noel_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Deut, #80 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000066_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_adding_Gavin_Stewart_for_Deutsche_Bank_N, #81 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000067_Proof_of_Service_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_Filed_by_Austin_M_Noel, #82 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000068_Part_1_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request_to_Attend_Hearing_Te, #83 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000068_Part_2_Certificate_of_Necessity_-_Emergency_Motion, #84 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000069_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request, #85 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000070_Notice_Canceling_Hearing_Previously_Scheduled_for_December_13_2017_at_200pm_Date_in_Not, #86 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000071_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #87 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000072_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing_Filed_by_Anthony_T_Litsch_III_on_behalf_of_Attorney_Anthony_T_L, #88 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000073_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_To_Claim_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE_BAN, #89 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000074_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request, #90 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000075_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Debtor_has_21_days_to, #91 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000076_Withdrawal_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Filed_by_Tru, #92 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000077_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Ana_DeVilliers_Trustee_Atty_Anthony, #93 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000078_Order_Granting_Emergency_Ex-Parte_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Requ, #94 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000079_Notice_of_Hearing__Hearing_scheduled_for_2142018_at_0230_PM_at_Orlando_FL_-_Courtroom, #95 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000080_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #96 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000081_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_on_Emergency_Ex-Parte_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding, #97 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000082_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #98 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000084_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Doug_Goldin, #99
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by Julie Baker Zalloum. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-bk-02329-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zalloum v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: River Oaks Community Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Locke Lord LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: River Oaks III HOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Trustee Laurie K Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Fran Elise Zion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Fran Elise Zion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?