Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-Americana, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and SVC-West, LLC
Defendant: Harold O Miller, Domains By Proxy LLC, Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Doe #1, John E Mortimer, Doe #2, Does #3-10 and Solomon Cross, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00817
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to John E Mortimer, Solomon Cross, Inc. (AC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AC)
June 25, 2019 Set scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 9/12/2019, Discovery due by 7/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 8/3/2020, Pretrial statement due by 10/20/2020, All other motions due by 10/27/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Bench Trial set for 12/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 7/31/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2020. (AC)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/25/2019. (MMW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Bennington, Alfred)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Bennington, Alfred)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Harold O Miller, John E Mortimer, Solomon Cross, Inc. filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-West, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, SVC-West, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bennington, Alfred)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bennington, Alfred)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Harold O Miller. (Hoepker, Todd)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants Harold O Miller and Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/31/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC answer or response due 6/27/2019; Harold O Miller answer or response due 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/28/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Harold O Miller. (Hoepker, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 5/29/2019 (AC).
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. Related case(s): no. (Bennington, Alfred)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #6 Interested Persons Order by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred) Modified on 5/20/2019 (AC). Modified on 5/20/2019 (AC).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/3/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/3/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Domains By Proxy LLC, Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Harold O Miller. (AC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-817-Orl-40TBS. (SJB)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against Domains By Proxy LLC, Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC, Harold O Miller (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15410657) filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(Bennington, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-Americana, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-West, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold O Miller
Represented By: Todd M. Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains By Proxy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold O. Miller Attorney, LLC
Represented By: Todd M. Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does #3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Cross, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?