4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC v. David et al

Plaintiff: 4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC
Defendant: Aida David, Unknown Tenants in Possession and John David
Case Number: 6:2019cv00857
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Mail returned as Unable to Forward/No Mail Receptacle re: #5 ORDER. Mail NOT resent to John David. (AC)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by 4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. 2) is DENIED. The case is REMANDED to the County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Osceola County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court for the County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Osceola County, Florida and to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/29/2019. (MMW)
May 20, 2019 Mail returned as Unable to Forward/No Mail Receptacle re: #4 Notice to counsel of Local Rule, #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by 4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC. Mail NOT resent to John David. (AC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Brooke R. Skaggs of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (AC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Failure to file written objections to the proposed findings and recommendations contained in this report within fourteen days from the date of its filing shall bar an aggrieved party from attacking the factual findings on appeal. If the parties have no objection to this report and recommendation, they may promptly file a joint notice of no objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/9/2019. (HMK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John David, Aida David, and Unknown Tenants in Possession. (AC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/10/2019 (AC).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola County Court, case number 2019-CC-1254EV, filed by John David, Aida David, and Unknown Tenants in Possession. (Filed in State Court on 4/29/19) (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(AC) Modified on 5/10/2019 (AC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC v. David et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4460 Nirvana Pkwy LLC
Represented By: Jerry Michael Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenants in Possession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?