Mubarak v. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nadia Mubarak
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Steven Way and Randy Cefalu
Case Number: 6:2019cv00896
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Randy Cefalu, Steven Way identifying Corporate Parent B&N Education, LLC, Corporate Parent Barnes & Noble Education, Inc. for Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC.. (Phillips, J.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Randy Cefalu, Steven Way. Related case(s): No (Phillips, J.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Randy Cefalu, Steven Way. (Phillips, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #15 Order directing compliance, #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nadia Mubarak. Related case(s): yes (BIA)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #3. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (JLC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 06/27/2019 by Nadia Mubarak as to Steven Way. (BIA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 06/27/2019 by Nadia Mubarak as to Randy Cefalu. (BIA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Randy Cefalu, Steven Way. (BIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/13/19. (PKK)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Nadia Mubarak. (BIA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet re #6 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Nadia Mubarak (BIA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing First Page of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #6 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Nadia Mubarak (BIA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Page Five of the Complaint re #6 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Nadia Mubarak (BIA)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. It is also ORDERED that on or before June 20, 2019, Plaintiff shall file copies of the fifth page of the Complaint, the Civil Cover Sheet, and the first page of the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs with her handwritten signatures. Failure to timely file the copies with the handwritten signatures may result in the case being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/30/2019. (MB)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nadia Mubarak. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Randy Cefalu, Steven Way with Jury Demand filed by Nadia Mubarak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mubarak v. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Way
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Cefalu
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Mubarak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?