Brooks v. General Parts Distribution, LLC

Plaintiff: Wayne Brooks
Defendant: General Parts Distribution, LLC
Petitioner: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 6:2019cv00952
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by General Parts Distribution, LLC. Related case(s): no (Bleakley, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by General Parts Distribution, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Parts, Inc. for General Parts Distribution, LLC.. (Bleakley, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by General Parts Distribution, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Parts, Inc. for General Parts Distribution, LLC.. (Bleakley, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Wayne Brooks. (Steinhaus, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #5 Related Case Order by Wayne Brooks. Related case(s): No (Steinhaus, Christopher) Modified on 6/5/2019 (RDO).
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest of Workers' Compensation Lien (D'Ambrosio, Joseph) Modified on 6/4/2019 (RDO).
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (D'Ambrosio, Joseph) Modified on 6/4/2019 (RDO).
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest of Workers' Compensation Lien (D'Ambrosio, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (D'Ambrosio, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT and AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by General Parts Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court ANSWER Answer, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Combined State Court file, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit B - FL Dept of Corporations, #7 Exhibit C - Ledger, #8 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing)(Bleakley, Robert) Modified on 5/30/2019 (RDO).
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Steinhaus on behalf of Wayne Brooks (Steinhaus, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 (WRONG EVENT CODE USED. REFILED AT ENTRY #10) AMENDED document by General Parts Distribution, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 State Court Other Documents)(Bleakley, Robert) Modified on 5/30/2019 (RDO).
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 (WRONG PDF. REFILED AT ENTRY #9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Steinhaus on behalf of Wayne Brooks (Steinhaus, Christopher) Modified on 5/30/2019 (RDO).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to file an amended notice of removal on or before May 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/22/2019. (JRJ)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Parts Distribution, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal EX E to Notice of Removal (Bleakley, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-952-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15489361 filed by General Parts Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit)(Bleakley, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. General Parts Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Brooks
Represented By: William Clay Mitchell, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Steinhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parts Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Robert Bleakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Joseph P. D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?