De Jesus et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Aida de Jesus and Lydia de Leon
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00956
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Kimberly Sands appointed as Mediator. (BIA)
June 20, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2019, Discovery due by 4/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2020, Pretrial statement due by 8/14/2020, All other motions due by 8/28/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 7/1/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/17/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2020 (BIA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/20/2019. (TKW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ayvazian, Emily)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/13/2019. (Presnell, Gregory)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to be Excused from the In-Person Meeting Requirement of the Court's Related Case Order and Track Two Notice by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Ayvazian, Emily)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Marsh, Kristina)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Marsh, Kristina)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Aida De Jesus, Lydia De Leon identifying Other Affiliate ClaimsMax Adjuster, Inc. for Aida De Jesus, Lydia De Leon.. (Baldwin, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aida De Jesus, Lydia De Leon. Related case(s): No (Baldwin, Matthew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lee Baldwin on behalf of Aida De Jesus, Lydia De Leon (Baldwin, Matthew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marsh, Kristina) Modified on 5/30/2019 (BIA).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/24/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/24/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Marcus R. Rodriguez of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk)(ctp). (BIA)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-956-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-001277-CI filed in State Court on 04/17/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15492304 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayvazian, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida de Jesus
Represented By: Louis Anthony Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia de Leon
Represented By: Louis Anthony Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Chalela Ayvazian
Represented By: Kristina L. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?