Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Benny Bird Company, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc. doing business as Jondora Music and EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music
Defendant: MCKENNA'S PLACE PORT ORANGE, INC., CHRISTOPHER MCKENNA, McKenna and McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc. doing business as McKenna's Place Seafood Sports & Spirits also known as McKenna's Port Orange
Case Number: 6:2019cv00971
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Set deadline: for All Defendants. Answer due by 8/7/2019 per #11 Endorsed Order. (AC)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Meet with Counsel for the Purpose of Filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/15/2019. (HMK)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Meet with Counsel for the Purpose of Filing a Case Management Report. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 7, 2019. The parties shall meet for the purposes of preparing a case management report on or before July 30, 2019. All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/15/2019. (HMK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/7/19 to Respond to #1 Complaint and to 7/30/19 to Meet with Counsel for the Purpose of Filing a Case Managment Report by All Defendants. (Sandman, Lori) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 7/9/2019 (AC).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 (Counsel to Re-file/Signature Incorrect)-Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Meet with Counsel for the Purpose of Filing a Case Managment Report by All Defendants. (Sandman, Lori) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 7/9/2019 (AC).
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.; Corporate Parent Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent EIGHTH NOTE, INC. for Concord Music Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Messa, Zachary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. Related case(s): no (Messa, Zachary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 5/30/19 by House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broken Arrow Music Corporation as to Christopher McKenna. (Messa, Zachary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 5/30/19 by House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Benny Bird Company, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broken Arrow Music Corporation as to McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc. (Messa, Zachary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Christopher McKenna, McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc. (AC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-971-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15501090) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons - McKenna's, #4 Proposed Summons Summons - Christopher McKenna)(Messa, Zachary) Modified on 5/28/2019 (AC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Bird Company, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broken Arrow Music Corporation
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc. doing business as Jondora Music
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKENNA'S PLACE PORT ORANGE, INC.
Represented By: Lori J. Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER MCKENNA
Represented By: Lori J. Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenna
Represented By: Lori J. Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenna's Place Port Orange, Inc. doing business as McKenna's Place Seafood Sports & Spirits also known as McKenna's Port Orange
Represented By: Lori J. Sandman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?