RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. v. Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC
Plaintiff: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00972
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-972-ORL-37-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Remark: Doc. #16 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/16/2019. (MT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC. (BIA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED summons to be issued by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Dobuler, Dale)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. Related case(s): No (Dobuler, Dale) Modified on 6/21/2019 (BIA).
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Dobuler, Dale)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion for Brian Rawson to appear pro hac vice; granting #14 motion for Roy McKay to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/20/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Roy McKay to appear pro hac vice by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobuler, Dale) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 6/21/2019 (BIA).
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Brian Rawson to appear pro hac vice by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobuler, Dale) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 6/21/2019 (BIA).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/17/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Brian Rawson to appear pro hac vice by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobuler, Dale) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Rob McKay to appear pro hac vice by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobuler, Dale) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC with Jury Demand. filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dobuler, Dale)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 **ENTERED IN ERROR**
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/6/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/6/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 3, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 6/10/2019 (BIA)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Brian S. Rawson, Roy B. McKay, and Darrell L. Barger of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Sally Helen Seltzer of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL-83026 filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. v. Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Scott Dobuler
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Roy McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junkyard Saloon/Bombshell's Tavern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?