Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Sumday Vacations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. and Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Defendant: Sumday Vacations, LLC and Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00982
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Joint Motion for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction. This Court possesses jurisdiction over this matter, and venue is proper in this Court. The parties affected by this Order and Permanent Injunction consent to this Permanent Injunction's entry and final judgment to resolve all matters in dispute between them. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/16/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 8, 2020 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Against Sumday Vacations, LLC and Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Permanent Injunction Order Against Sumday Vacations, LLC and Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #42 The Joint Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction against Sumday Vacations, LLC and Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, to move the Court to enter a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or, on good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 5, 2020 Filing 42 Joint Stipulation and MOTION for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction against Sumday Vacations, LLC and Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order for Final Permanent Injunction)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 5/6/2020 (ARJ).
March 6, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC, Sumday Vacations, LLC.(Klein, Buffey)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #39 Motion to Compel. The certification - and the conferral it certifies - is insufficient to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) or the CMSO. Doc. 31. If the motion is re-filed, the parties are directed to first confer in person or via telephone in a good faith effort to resolve the issues raised by the motion. Any further violations of the Court's rules or orders by Plaintiff will result in a show cause hearing at which Mr. Backman and Mr. Epstein shall be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/25/2020.(Irick, Daniel)
February 25, 2020 Filing 39 Amended MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Discovery and Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #37 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's counsel is admonished that it should know better than to file a discovery motion that lacks a certification pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g) or any indication that the parties conferred in person or via telephone concerning the motion itself and the relief requested therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/25/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Discovery and Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count I of the Amended Complaint #9 is DISMISSED without prejudice. In all other respects, the Motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/21/2020. (RMF)ctp
November 5, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before James Nulman, Esq.. (Vieira, Olga)
October 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SELECTION of James Nulman as mediator by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Modified on 10/18/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use correct judge's code on future pleadings
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/3/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (ALL)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/15/2020, Pretrial statement due by 11/23/2020, All other motions due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/13/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/15/2020, Trial Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger, Bench Trial set for trial term commencing 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/17/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/2/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION re 27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ESI Protocol by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-982-Orl-78DCI. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to strike re: #26 Stipulation filed by Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/2/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File ESI Protocol or to Advise Court of Any Issues Regarding Same. On or before 8/14/2019, the parties shall submit their ESI Protocol to the Court and, if applicable, advise the Court of any disputes regarding that Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/1/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 26 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #28** STIPULATION as to Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure of Information Subject to the Gramm-Leach-Bliley Act by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Modified on 8/5/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 First Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File ESI Protocol or to Advise Court of Any Issues Regarding Same by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Epstein, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 Remark: Docs. #19 and #20 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/19. (MT)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #18 Order to Show Cause in light of Defendants' filings #19 and #20. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ESG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, #14 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Sumday Vacations, LLC. (Klein, Buffey) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BIA).
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Holiday Planners, LLC for Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC.. (Klein, Buffey) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BIA).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to show cause by written response why they failed to timely file compliant Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements as to Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC, Sumday Vacations, LLC. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to #11 Motion to dismiss and #14 Motion to dismiss. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/9/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , and Rule 9(b) Motion to Dismiss, #14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and 9(b) Motion to Dismiss by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to strike re: #13 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Sumday Vacations, LLC, #12 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and 9(b) Motion to Dismiss by Sumday Vacations, LLC. (Klein, Buffey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #15** CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Sumday Vacations, LLC. (Klein, Buffey) Modified on 6/26/2019 (BIA).
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #15** CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC. (Klein, Buffey) Modified on 6/26/2019 (BIA).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , and Rule 9(b) Motion to Dismiss by Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC. (Klein, Buffey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Epstein, Richard) Modified on 6/20/2019 (BIA).
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC, Sumday Vacations, LLC filed by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC.(Epstein, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/4/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/4/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 29, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 6/5/2019 (BIA)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/29/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Doc. #2 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/29/19. (ESG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC, Sumday Vacations, LLC. (BIA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-982-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management and Exchange Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC.. (Epstein, Richard)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC, Sumday Vacations, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15506121) filed by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Epstein, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Sumday Vacations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumday Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Buffey Elizabeth Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Timeshare Transfers, LLC
Represented By: Buffey Elizabeth Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?