Pleat v. Heeren et al

Plaintiff: Michael Pleat
Defendant: State Farm Insurance, Ashley Heeren and Ashley Fanielle Heeren
Case Number: 6:2019cv00983
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Michael Pleat. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Michael Pleat.(Aronson, Stanley)
May 30, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of Florida as case 2:19-cv-14188, filed on 5/30/19. (MAA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSFER to the District of Southern District of Florida, Fort Pierce Division. (MAA)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Michael Pleat. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court, Southern District of Florida, Ft. Pierce Division. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/29/2019. (MMW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Ashley Fanielle Heeren, State Farm Insurance. (AC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-983-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15509139) filed by Michael Pleat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Aronson, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleat v. Heeren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Heeren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Fanielle Heeren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pleat
Represented By: Stanley Phillip Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?