Leo v. Main Event Entertainment, LP et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Leo
Defendant: Main Event Entertainment, LP and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv01006
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 22) on or before August 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/26/2019. (MDH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Strike Amended Complain by Jennifer Leo. (Young, Logan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Strike Amended Complain by John Doe, Main Event Entertainment, LP. (Ramsey, Richard) Modified on 7/19/2019 (DMA).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file their response to the #16 Amended Complaint on or before July 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/9/2019. (MDH) Modified on 7/10/2019 (RDO).
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Amended Complaint by John Doe, Main Event Entertainment, LP. (Ramsey, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion does not comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/9/2019. (MDH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Ramsey, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #7 Motion to Strike. The motions are rendered moot by the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2019. (SCM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Main Event Entertainment, LP with Jury Demand. filed by Jennifer Leo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Young, Logan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jennifer Leo. Related case(s): yes (Young, Logan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of REMOVAL by John Doe, Main Event Entertainment, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit M to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit State Docs, #4 Exhibit Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Under Seal)(Ramsey, Richard) Modified on 6/19/2019 (RDO).
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by John Doe, Main Event Entertainment, LP. Related case(s): yes (Ramsey, Richard) Modified on 6/19/2019 (RDO).
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS and CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #5 Interested Persons Order by John Doe, Main Event Entertainment, LP. (Ramsey, Richard) Modified on 6/19/2019 (RDO).
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jennifer Leo. (Young, Logan)
June 11, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (RDO)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 7) on or before June 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/10/2019. (MDH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Strike by Jennifer Leo. (Young, Logan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #1 MOTION for leave to file certain exhibits under seal MOTION for leave to file under seal by Main Event Entertainment, LP. (Ramsey, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or in the alternative, MOTION to Strike and incorporated memorandum of law by All Defendants. (originally filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 5/14/19)(RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Leo. (Originally filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 4/22/19)(RDO)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1006-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit, Orange County, case number 2019-CA-004957-O filed in State Court on 04/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15523553 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramsey, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to file certain exhibits under seal by All Defendants. (Ramsey, Richard) Modified on 5/31/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo v. Main Event Entertainment, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Event Entertainment, LP
Represented By: Richard E. Ramsey
Represented By: Charlene C. Poblete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Richard E. Ramsey
Represented By: Charlene C. Poblete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Leo
Represented By: Logan Jay Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?