United Fire & Casualty Company v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Progressive Express Ins. Co. and Progressive Express Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01049
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #5 Motion to dismiss filed by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Neilson, Willard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1049-ORL-41-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Williams, Zachary)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Responses due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/10/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Neilson, Willard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/10/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for the Case Management Conference by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Alexander, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United Fire & Casualty Company. Related case(s): yes (Neilson, Willard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Progressive Express Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Williams, Zachary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by United Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent United Fire Group, Inc. for United Fire & Casualty Company.. (Neilson, Willard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Progressive Express Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation for Progressive Express Insurance Company.. (Williams, Zachary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Williams on behalf of Progressive Express Insurance Company (Williams, Zachary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Alexander on behalf of Progressive Express Insurance Company (Alexander, Megan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Responses due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/24/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Neilson, Willard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Young, B.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/13/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/27/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 6/13/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1049-Orl-41TBS. (SJB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit In and For Orange County, case number 2019-CA-005484-O filed in State Court on 05/06/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15549064 filed by Progressive Express Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 5, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 5, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 of 5, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 of 5, #5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 of 5, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Fire & Casualty Company v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Ins. Co.
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan Marshall Thompson
Represented By: Megan Alexander
Represented By: Kyle J. Rash
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Represented By: Zachary David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: W. Lane Neilson
Represented By: Willard Lane Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?