Jasper Contractors, Inc. et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rohe and Jasper Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01100
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this case is REMANDED to the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida, Case No. 2019-CA-001340-15-G. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/2/2019. (DJD)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/26/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/10/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 6/26/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-001340 filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 6/26/2019 (SPM).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to show cause as to why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to AIG Property Casualty Company. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/24/2019. (DJD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1100-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company. (Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 6/14/2019 (SPM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-001340-15-G filed in State Court on 5/2/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15576583 filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 6/14/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasper Contractors, Inc. et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rohe
Represented By: Ian Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Horn
Represented By: Roger A. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Scott Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?