Jasper Contractors, Inc. v. ASI Assurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Jasper Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: ASI Assurance Corporation and ASI Assurance Corp.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01101
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2019. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Osceola County, Florida. The Clerk is directed to close the file. (MAF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Remand to State Court by ASI Assurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheihing, Michaela) Modified on 7/15/2019 (LMM).
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jasper Contractors, Inc.. (Hatfield, Roger)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jasper Contractors, Inc. Related case(s): no (Hatfield, Roger) Modified on 7/3/2019 (LMM).
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by ASI Assurance Corp.. Related case(s): y (Scheihing, Michaela)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by ASI Assurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent American Strategic Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate Jasper Contractors, Inc., Other Affiliate ASI Lloyds, Other Affiliate ASI Preferred Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate Michaela D. Scheihing, Other Affiliate Southeast Law Group, P.A., Other Affiliate Progressive Property Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ASI Assurance Corp., Other Affiliate ASI Select Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate ASI Select Auto Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate ASI Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ASI Home Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate Sunshine Security Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Egondu Nwaokorie, Other Affiliate Okey Nwaokorie, Other Affiliate Roger Hatfield for ASI Assurance Corp... (Scheihing, Michaela)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/17/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/17/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Notice of Removal by ASI Assurance Corp. (Scheihing, Michaela) Modified on 6/14/2019 (LMM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1101-Orl-31LRH. (SJB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit of Florida, case number 2019-CA-001456 filed in State Court on May 3, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15576611 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Scheihing, Michaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasper Contractors, Inc. v. ASI Assurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASI Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Michaela D. Scheihing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASI Assurance Corp.
Represented By: Michaela D. Scheihing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Roger A. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?