Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. Domains By Proxy LLC et al
Plaintiff: SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-Americana, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and SVC-West, LLC
Defendant: DOE #3, DOE #2, Domains By Proxy LLC, DOE #1 and Domains By Proxy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01105
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1105-Orl-78EJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1105-Orl-40EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by SVC-Americana, LLC, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, SVC-West, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. Related case(s): No. (Bennington, Alfred)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/21/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/21/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (GNB).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MAA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Domains By Proxy, LLC. (MAA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1105-Orl-40TBS. (SJB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against DOE #1, DOE #2, DOE #3, Domains By Proxy LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15577305) filed by SVC-Americana, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, SVC-Hawaii, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., SVC-West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bennington, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. Domains By Proxy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains By Proxy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains By Proxy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-Americana, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVC-West, LLC
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael L. Gore
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?