United States of America v. Roux
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gregory A Roux
Case Number: 6:2019cv01117
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Gregory A Roux. (DeWitt, Tyler)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Gregory A Roux shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/6/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gregory A Roux.(DeWitt, Tyler)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 07/11/2019 by United States of America as to Gregory A Roux. (Nasta, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Nasta, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (Nasta, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/21/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/21/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Gregory A Roux. (AC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1117-Orl-40GJK. (NAS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory A Roux filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Nasta, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Roux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A Roux
Represented By: Tyler Harrison DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Paul Nasta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?