Perez et al v. U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Perez and Omayra Montes
Defendant: Tony Capley and U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01154
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/6/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion Requesting Telephonic Case Management Meeting. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/1/2019. (RML)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Requesting Telephonic Case Management Meeting by Omayra Montes, Miguel A. Perez. (Palma, Zandro)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/29/19. (MT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tony Capley, U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Ramirez Jefferson, Raquel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Tony Capley, U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Southern Bell Holdings, LLC for U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc... (Ramirez Jefferson, Raquel) Modified on 7/29/2019 (DMA).
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Tony Capley, U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc..(Ramirez Jefferson, Raquel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1154-ORL-37-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 7/9/2019 by Miguel A. Perez, Omayra Montes as to Tony Capley. (Palma, Zandro)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 07/01/2019 by Miguel A. Perez, Omayra Montes as to U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc.. (Palma, Zandro)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/19. (MT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Omayra Montes, Miguel A. Perez. Related case(s): n (Palma, Zandro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Omayra Montes, Miguel A. Perez. (Palma, Zandro)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Tony Capley, U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc. (BIA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1154-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Capley, U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15606514) filed by Miguel A. Perez, Omayra Montes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Palma, Zandro) Modified on 6/24/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Capley
Represented By: Raquel Ramirez Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Leader Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Raquel Ramirez Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Perez
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omayra Montes
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?