Pringle v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donnell Pringle
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. and Disney Worldwide Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01172
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Owens, Gregory)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.(Martin, Meagan) Modified on 8/14/2019 (BIA).
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Remark: Doc. #15 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/8/19/ (ESG)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Telephonically, provided the parties agree on the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/8/2019. (MB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Donnell Pringle. (Owens, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Telephonically by Donnell Pringle. (Owens, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 8/8/2019 (BIA).
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/24/19. (MT)
July 23, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. Answer due by 8/14/2019. (BIA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Leigh Martin on behalf of Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Martin, Meagan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/23/2019. (HMK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Muldowney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. Related case(s): No (Muldowney, Patrick)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Disney Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate TWDC Enterprises 18 Corporation for Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc... (Muldowney, Patrick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Donnell Pringle. Related case(s): yes (Owens, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 7/03/2019 by Donnell Pringle as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Owens, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 7/03/2019 by Donnell Pringle as to Disney Worldwide Services, Inc.. (Owens, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/27/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (BIA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1172-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15613752) filed by Donnell Pringle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Owens, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Worldwide Services, Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Pringle
Represented By: Gregory A. Owens
Represented By: Miguel Bouzas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?