Crayton et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Lydia H. Crayton, Andrae Crayton and Lydia Crayton
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Kim Doyel, Derek Adams, PFG Loans, Inc., Kaitlyn E. Arnold, Provident Funding Associates, L.P. and S. Contreras
Case Number: 6:2019cv01201
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER striking #17 Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs filed the Amended Complaint outside the time permitted by Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15(a), and therefore, they may amend their Complaint only with the opposing party's written consent or the court's leave. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/28/2019. (SCM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 **STRICKEN per 18 Order** AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association with Jury Demand. filed by Lydia H. Crayton, Andrae Crayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 0, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(AC) Modified on 8/28/2019 (SPM).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #14 Plaintiffs' Possibly Opposed Motion to File Response to Motion to Dismiss One Day Late. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/26/2019. (RMN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Andrae Crayton, Lydia H. Crayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Possibly Opposed Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to File Response to Motion to Dismiss, One Day Late by Andrae Crayton, Lydia H. Crayton. (AC)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Motion is DENIED. The Motion for Leave to Add Defendants is GRANTED. The Motion for Enlargement of Time to Amend Complaint or Respond to Motion Until After the Court Rules on Motion to Add Defendants is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/1/2019. (JRJ)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Cooper, Jarrett)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave to Add Additional Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 19(1)(A), and to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Add Defendants, Or Alternatively to the Stay, for an Enlargement of Time to Amend Their Complaint, and Respond to Motion to Dismiss, Until After teh Court Rules on TheMotion to Add Additional Defendants by Andrae Crayton, Lydia H. Crayton. (AC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1201-ORL-40-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Judgment)(Cooper, Jarrett) Modified on 7/25/2019 (AC).
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant and Designation of E-mail Addresses by Jarrett Evan Cooper on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Cooper, Jarrett) Modified on 7/24/2019 (AC).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE-Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Andrae Crayton, Lydia H. Crayton (AC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order pdf filed by Andrae Crayton, Lydia H. Crayton. (AC)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Plaintiffs. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/3/2019. (JRJ)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Bank National Association. (AC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association with Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number ORL083691. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachments part 1, #2 Attachments part 2, #3 Attachments part 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crayton et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia H. Crayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrae Crayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Crayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jarrett Evan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Doyel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFG Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlyn E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?