Doe v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01218
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BIA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of settlement by John Doe (Cabassa, Luis)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019, Discovery due by 5/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/2/2020, Pretrial statement due by 9/17/2020, All other motions due by 9/24/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/31/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/28/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Conduct mediation hearing by 5/15/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (CTP)(JLC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hollingsworth, Liana)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/18/19. (MT)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Big Lots Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Big Lots, Inc. for Big Lots Stores, Inc... (Hollingsworth, Liana)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Hollingsworth, Liana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/16/19. (MT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by John Doe. (Cabassa, Luis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Doe. Related case(s): yes (Cabassa, Luis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/11/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Big Lots Stores, Inc..(Hollingsworth, Liana)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1218-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-006468 filed in State Court on May 27, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15646074 filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, and State Court aCivil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Liana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Represented By: Scott Michael Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Liana Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?