Ramos v. BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC
Plaintiff: Julio Ramos
Defendant: BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01229
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bard, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER denying #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/5/2019. (PKK)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC. (Bard, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Julio Ramos. (Hoogerwoerd, Peter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Docs. #10 and #12 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/26/19. (MT)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Julio Ramos. (Saavedra, Nathaly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julio Ramos. Related case(s): y (Saavedra, Nathaly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC. (Hearing, Gregory)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC. Related case(s): no (Hearing, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel, Carlos D. Serrano, of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM)
July 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Provided the parties agree on the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/13/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference by Julio Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saavedra, Nathaly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim and Memorandum of Law in Support by BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC. (Hearing, Gregory) Modified on 7/15/2019 (LMM).
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1229-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-ca-006530-O filed in State Court on May 28, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15652557 filed by BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Return of Service)(Hearing, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP Medicare Insurance III, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Represented By: Benjamin W. Bard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Ramos
Represented By: Nathaly Saavedra
Represented By: Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?