SOS Furniture Company, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Petitioner: SOS Furniture Company, Inc.
Respondent: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01248
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #18 Order to show cause filed by SOS Furniture Company, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by SOS Furniture Company, Inc.. (McKown, Aaron)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by SOS Furniture Company, Inc. Related case(s): No (McKown, Aaron) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/31/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Quinn, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): No (Quinn, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Quinn, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/10/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/10/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Presnell and Magistrate Judge Kelly. New Case Number: 6:19-cv-1248-Orl-31GJK. (MAA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-22606. File received electronically
June 28, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division, and mark this CLOSED in this District. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division, and mark this CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Quinn, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking #5 Status Report filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert) Modified Text on 7/1/2019 (ls). [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Status Report. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11757029, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Quinn, Robert)[Transferred from flsd on 7/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOS Furniture Company, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert M. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SOS Furniture Company, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?