Stuckey v. Lemma et al
Plaintiff: Stephan Kent Stuckey
Defendant: C. Williams, A. Jones, Beddard, Dennis Lemma, Howard, Dr. Westhead, L. Howard, L. Beddard and W. Rex
Case Number: 6:2019cv01271
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #5 Motion to appoint counsel ; denying #19 Motion ; denying #20 Motion to appoint counsel. Plaintiff's Written Objections (Doc. 22) to Magistrate Judge Kelly's Orders of July 15, 2019 (Doc. 3), July 23, 2019 (Doc. 8), July 25, 2019 (Doc. 11), and August 1, 2019 (Doc. 13) are OVERRULED. Pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court must consider the "objections and modify or set aside any part of the order that is clearly erroneous or is contrary to law." Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that the Magistrate Judge's Orders were clearly erroneous or contrary to the law. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/5/2019. (TKW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTION re #8 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #11 Order on motion for issuance, #13 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #3 Order to file amended complaint, #18 Order pdf by Stephan Kent Stuckey by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (BIA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT re #13 Order against L. Beddard, L. Howard, A. Jones, W. Rex, C. Williams Terminating Dennis Lemma (Sheriff) and Dr. Westhead filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey.(AC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (JP) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for subpoena by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (JP)
August 15, 2019 Set deadline: Fourth Amended Complaint due by 8/28/2019. (AC)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that, on or before August 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a Fourth Amended Complaint that shall fully comply with the Court's Order of August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/15/2019. (TKW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against L. Beddard, L. Howard, A. Jones, Dennis Lemma, W. Rex, Dr. Westhead, C. Williams filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey.(AC)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/8/2019. (TKW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on motion for issuance by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (JP)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of inquiry by Stephan Kent Stuckey re #1 Complaint (copy of docket sheet mailed). (DMA)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint as described above within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order. Directions to the Clerk. ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/1/2019. (TKW)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order to file amended complaint by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (LMM)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 motion for issuance of subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/25/2019. (LMM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against L. Beddard, L. Howard, A. Jones, Dennis Lemma, W. Rex, Dr. Westhead, C. Williams filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey.(LMM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for issuance of subpoena by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 24, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 8/19/2019 (LMM)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 motion to amend/correct. Plaintiff shall have until August 19, 2019, to file an amended complaint in compliance with the Court's Order of July 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/23/2019. (LMM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against L. Beddard, Howard, A. Jones, Dennis Lemma, Westhead, C. Williams, W. Rex filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey.(LMM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (LMM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stephan Kent Stuckey. Related case(s): no. (LMM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to file amended complaint within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall mail Plaintiff a court-approved form to use for filing the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/15/2019. (LMM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Stephan Kent Stuckey. (No fee paid or IFP motion submitted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuckey v. Lemma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Lemma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Westhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Beddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Rex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Kent Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?