Lekan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Lenkan and Joseph Lekan
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01283
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Remark: Docs. #10 and #11 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/7/19. (ESG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Conley, Colleen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Joseph Lekan. (Maxwell, Bruce)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Conley, Colleen) Modified on 8/1/2019 (DMA).
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1283-ORL-37-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing removal of Albert J. Lechner from the CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/16/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Request to Remove Attorney from service list by Joseph Lekan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lechner, Albert) Modified on 7/16/2019 (LMM).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel, Lawrence I. Hauser, of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1283-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Based on Diversity Jurisdiction from 18th Judicial Circuit Court in and for Seminole County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000421 filed in State Court on 2/6/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15679692 filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit (a), #2 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit (b), #3 State Court ANSWER Exhibit (c), #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (d), #5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (e), #6 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (f), #7 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (g), #8 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (h), #9 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (i), #10 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (j), #11 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (k), #12 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (l), #13 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (m), #14 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (n), #15 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (o), #16 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (p), #17 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (q), #18 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (r), #19 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (s), #20 State Court Other Documents Exhibit (t), #21 Exhibit (u) Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories, #22 Exhibit (v) Correspondence Dated 9/18/18, #23 Exhibit (w) Correspondence Dated 12/4/18 & 12/31/18, #24 Exhibit (x) CRN, #25 Exhibit (y) CRN Response, #26 Civil Cover Sheet Form JS44)(Conley, Colleen) Modified on 7/15/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lekan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Colleen Annette Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Colleen Annette Conley
Represented By: Dale T. Gobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lenkan
Represented By: Albert H. Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lekan
Represented By: Albert H. Lechner
Represented By: Bruce Alan Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?