Friedman v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Martin M. Friedman
Defendant: Earl D Randel and United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv01306
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendations; granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/4/2019. (SCM)
August 19, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations, #5 Interested persons order, #4 Related case order and track 2 notice. The Post Office attempted to deliver the mail but they were unable to and unable to forward. Mail not resent to Martin M. Friedman. (RDO)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Earl D Randel. It is RECOMMENDED that the Motion (Doc. 8) be GRANTED, that the case be DISMISSED with prejudice, and that the Clerk be directed to close the case. ORDER granting re #7 MOTION/NOTICE to Substitute the United States for Earl D. Randel. The United States is hereby substituted as the proper party defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/14/2019. (SPM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Earl D Randel. (Ragler, Phillip)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1306-Orl-40DCI. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #7 MOTION/NOTICE to Substitute the United States for Earl D. Randel, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (MAA)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER transferring case to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/25/2019. (MDH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Earl D Randel. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/NOTICE by Earl D Randel to Substitute the United States for Earl D. Randel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ragler, Phillip) Modified on 7/24/2019 (RDO).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1306-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Earl D Randel. Related case(s): y (Ragler, Phillip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit of Florida Orange County, case number 2019-SC-16275-O filed in State Court on 05/17/19. filed by Earl D Randel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl D Randel
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?